Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1050709

EP1050709 - Method and device for dispensing liquefied gas [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.05.2003
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 15.07.2009  [2009/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Linde AG
Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
[2002/06]
Former [2000/49]For all designated states
Linde Gas AG
Seitnerstrasse 70
82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
Former [2000/45]For all designated states
Linde Technische Gase GmbH
Seitnerstrasse 70
82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Neubauer, Uwe, Dipl.-Ing.(FH)
Kiefernweg 3a
91227 Leinburg / DE
02 / Schmidtke, Wolfgang
Fürstenallee 12
33102 Paderborn / DE
[2000/45]
Representative(s)Kasseckert, Rainer
Linde Aktiengesellschaft
Patent und Marken
Dr.-Carl-von-Lindestrasse 6-14
82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/29]Kasseckert, Rainer
Linde Aktiengesellschaft Patent und Marken Dr.-Carl-von-Lindestrasse 6-14
82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
Former [2000/45]Kasseckert, Rainer
Linde AG Zentrale Patentabteilung Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Strasse 6-14
82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
Application number, filing date00109380.602.05.2000
[2000/45]
Priority number, dateDE199912031403.05.1999         Original published format: DE 19920314
[2000/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1050709
Date:08.11.2000
Language:DE
[2000/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1050709
Date:16.05.2001
[2001/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:F17C9/00, F17C9/02, F17C3/10, F17C7/04, F17C13/08
[2001/20]
Former International [2000/45]F17C9/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/45]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Abgabe von verflüssigtem Gas[2000/45]
English:Method and device for dispensing liquefied gas[2000/45]
French:Procédé et Dispositif de distribution de gaz liquéfié[2000/45]
Examination procedure26.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/47]
03.12.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/28]
07.02.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/28]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200203   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4995234  (KOOY RICHARD J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8 * column 8, line 34 - line 40; figure 1 * * column 10, line 65 - line 68 * * column 11, line 19 - line 33 *;
 [X]US5571231  (LEE RON C [US]) [X] 1,2,7,8,14 * column 2, line 30 - line 31; figure 1 * * column 2, line 52 - line 54 *;
 [XA]US4620962  (BRODBECK HOWARD D [US]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * column 3, line 37 - line 48; figure 1; claims 1,17 * * column 4, line 17 - line 23 * [A] 3,9,12;
 [A]US2944405  (BASORE CLEBURNE A, et al) [A] 1-14 * column 4, line 3 - line 26; figure 1 *