Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1050838

EP1050838 - Card readind device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.11.2008
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.12.2008  [2008/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TYCO Electronics Logistics AG
Ampèrestrasse 3
9323 Steinach / SG / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/45]For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Logistics AG
AMPèrestrasse 3
9323 Steinach / SG / CH
Inventor(s)01 / De Winter, Stefaan
Fortstrat 38
9230 Wetteren / BE
[2000/45]
Representative(s)Hirsch, Peter
Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/45]Hirsch, Peter
Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106
80797 München / DE
Application number, filing date00109515.704.05.2000
[2000/45]
Priority number, dateDE199912102206.05.1999         Original published format: DE 19921022
[2000/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1050838
Date:08.11.2000
Language:DE
[2000/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1050838
Date:06.11.2002
[2002/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:G06K7/00
[2000/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/45]
TitleGerman:Kartenlesevorrichtung[2000/45]
English:Card readind device[2000/45]
French:Dispositif de lecture de cartes[2000/45]
Examination procedure22.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/13]
11.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.06.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/49]
10.07.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2008/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
07.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
05.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
19.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
30.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
30.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200809   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0782089  (HIROSE ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5-11 * column 2, line 57 - column 4, line 39 * * figures 1,2,5 *;
 [A]EP0905827  (THOMAS & BETTS INT [US]) [A] 1,5-11 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0044] *;
 [A]US5901049  (SCHMIDT HELGE [DE], et al) [A] 1,3,4 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 36 *