EP1050833 - Predictive modeling of customer financial behavior [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fair Isaac Corporation 901 Marquette Avenue Suite 3200 Minneapolis, MN 55402 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states Fair Isaac Corporation 901 Marquette Avenue, Suite 3200 Minneapolis, MN 55402 / US | ||
Former [2000/45] | For all designated states HNC SOFTWARE INC. 5930 Cornerstone Court West San Diego, California 92121-3728 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lazarus, Michael A. 2222 Carmel Valley Road, Apt. 6 Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | 02 /
Blume, Matthias A.U. 10697 Glendover Lane San Diego, CA 92126 / US | 03 /
Brown, Kenneth B. 6960 Kensley Way San Diego, CA 92126 / US | 04 /
Caid, William R. 5438 Jamestown San Diego, CA 92117 / US | 05 /
Dunning, Ted E. 11797 River Rim Road San Diego, CA 92126 / US | 06 /
Peranich, Larry S. 11745 La Colina Road San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 07 /
Russell, Gerald R. 12427 Carmel Cape San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 08 /
Sitze, Kevin L. 9024 Woodlawn Road San Diego, CA 92126 / US | [2000/45] | Representative(s) | Schiuma, Daniele Wolfgang, et al Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/26] | Schiuma, Daniele Wolfgang, et al Müller-Boré & Partner Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/43] | Gosnall, Toby Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | ||
Former [2006/37] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2000/45] | Liesegang, Eva Forrester & Boehmert, Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00109516.5 | 04.05.2000 | [2000/45] | Priority number, date | US19990306237 | 06.05.1999 Original published format: US 306237 | [2000/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1050833 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1050833 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | [2004/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0202 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0207 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0241 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0255 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0269 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0601 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB [2004/50] |
Former [2000/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorhersagendes Modellisieren des finanziellen Verhaltens von Kunden | [2000/45] | English: | Predictive modeling of customer financial behavior | [2000/45] | French: | Modeler de façon prédictive le comportement financier de clients | [2000/45] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/46] | 18.09.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.01.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FR, IT | 18.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/22] | 13.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.10.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search |