Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1051939

EP1051939 - Lemon squeezer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.09.2003  [2003/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Diez, Stefan
Leiblweg 19
70192 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/46]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/46]
Representative(s)Fleck, Hermann-Josef
Jeck & Fleck
Patentanwälte
Klingengasse 2
71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]Fleck, Hermann-Josef, Dr.-Ing.
Klingengasse 2
71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE
Application number, filing date00109605.605.05.2000
[2000/46]
Priority number, dateDE199912141008.05.1999         Original published format: DE 19921410
[2000/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1051939
Date:15.11.2000
Language:DE
[2000/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1051939
Date:29.05.2002
[2002/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:A47J19/02
[2000/46]
Designated contracting states[2003/08]
Former [2000/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Zitruspresse[2000/46]
English:Lemon squeezer[2000/46]
French:Presse-citrons[2000/46]
Examination procedure30.11.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/37]
04.04.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
08.01.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
08.01.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]US1747641  (MORRIS ROBERT C) [X] 1 * page 1, line 54 - page 2, line 20; figures 1,2 * [A] 2;
 [XA]US2088815  (SCOTT GILBERT W) [X] 1,2 * page 1, column 2, lines 8-20 * * page 1, column 2, line 46 - page 2, column 1, line 2; figure -, * [A] 3;
 [A]US2195828  (MAX SALZ)