Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1050242

EP1050242 - Height adjustable device for furniture items in particular for elevating tables [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.05.2005
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KONRAD MERKT GMBH
Max-Planck-Strasse 30
D-78549 Spaichingen / DE
[2000/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Merkt, Manfred
Hauffstrasse 4
78549 Spaichingen / DE
[2000/45]
Representative(s)Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte
Grosstobeler Strasse 39
88276 Berg / Ravensburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/39]Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler
Patentanwälte Karlstrasse 8
88212 Ravensburg / DE
Former [2000/45]Patentanwälte Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler
Karlstrasse 8
88212 Ravensburg / DE
Application number, filing date00109607.205.05.2000
[2000/45]
Priority number, dateDE199912093907.05.1999         Original published format: DE 19920939
[2000/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1050242
Date:08.11.2000
Language:DE
[2000/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1050242
Date:28.11.2001
[2001/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1050242
Date:30.06.2004
Language:DE
[2004/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:A47B9/12
[2000/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/45]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Höhenverstellung von Möbelstücken, insbesondere Hubtischen[2000/45]
English:Height adjustable device for furniture items in particular for elevating tables[2000/45]
French:Dispositif de réglage en hauteur pour pièces d'ameublement en particulier pour tables élévatrices[2000/45]
Examination procedure07.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/16]
19.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.04.2004Fee for grant paid
30.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
09.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
27.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI30.06.2004
FR30.06.2004
GB30.06.2004
IE30.06.2004
IT30.06.2004
NL30.06.2004
DK30.09.2004
GR30.09.2004
SE30.09.2004
ES11.10.2004
PT30.11.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/35]FI30.06.2004
FR30.06.2004
GB30.06.2004
IE30.06.2004
IT30.06.2004
NL30.06.2004
DK30.09.2004
GR30.09.2004
SE30.09.2004
ES11.10.2004
Former [2006/47]FI30.06.2004
FR30.06.2004
GB30.06.2004
IE30.06.2004
NL30.06.2004
DK30.09.2004
GR30.09.2004
SE30.09.2004
ES11.10.2004
Former [2006/32]FI30.06.2004
FR30.06.2004
GB30.06.2004
IE30.06.2004
DK30.09.2004
GR30.09.2004
SE30.09.2004
ES11.10.2004
Former [2005/45]FI30.06.2004
GB30.06.2004
IE30.06.2004
DK30.09.2004
GR30.09.2004
SE30.09.2004
ES11.10.2004
Former [2005/24]FI30.06.2004
IE30.06.2004
DK30.09.2004
GR30.09.2004
SE30.09.2004
ES11.10.2004
Former [2005/23]FI30.06.2004
DK30.09.2004
GR30.09.2004
SE30.09.2004
ES11.10.2004
Former [2005/22]FI30.06.2004
DK30.09.2004
GR30.09.2004
SE30.09.2004
Former [2005/06]FI30.06.2004
GR30.09.2004
SE30.09.2004
Former [2005/02]FI30.06.2004
SE30.09.2004
Former [2004/52]SE30.09.2004
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE1429534  (FLEISCHER METALLWARENFAB W) [X] 1,3,13 * the whole document * [A] 10;
 [A]DE19626856  (HECKMANN PETER [DE]) [A] 1,3,13 * the whole document *
by applicantDE8411361U