EP1052354 - Vehicle door handle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2005 [2005/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Sicurezza Abitacolo S.p.A. Via Asti, 89 10026 Santena / IT | [2000/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Agostini, Astorre Via Della Costa, 51 10091 Alpignano / IT | [2000/46] | Representative(s) | Hervouet-Malbec, Sylvie, et al Valeo Sécurité Habitacle S.A.S. Service Propriété Industrielle 42, rue Le Corbusier Europarc 94042 Créteil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/49] | Hervouet, Sylvie, et al Valeo Sécurité Habitacle S.A.S. Service Propriété Industrielle 42, rue Le Corbusier Europarc 94042 Créteil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2002/26] | Croonenbroek, Thomas, et al Valeo Securité Habitacle, 42, rue Le Corbusier, Europarc 94042 Créteil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2000/46] | Cerbaro, Elena, Dr., et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 00109649.4 | 05.05.2000 | [2000/46] | Priority number, date | IT1999TO00381 | 07.05.1999 Original published format: IT TO990381 | [2000/46] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1052354 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1052354 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/20, E05B7/00, E05B65/12 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
E05B77/06 (EP,US);
E05B85/14 (EP,US);
Y10T292/57 (EP,US);
Y10T292/82 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2001/50] |
Former [2000/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeugtürgriff | [2000/46] | English: | Vehicle door handle | [2000/46] | French: | Poignée de véhicule automobile | [2000/46] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 21.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/16] | 16.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3453015 (MILLER JOHN) [A] 1,2,6 * the whole document *; | [XY]US3719248 (BREITSCHWERDT W, et al) [X] 1,2,6 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 62 * * column 5, line 21 - column 6, line 14; figures 5,6 * [Y] 8-11; | [A]WO9633079 (VALERO RUBIO LORENZO [ES]) [A] 1,6 * page 1, paragraphs 1-3 ** page 4, line 20 - page 5, line 12; figures 7,8 *; | [Y]DE19825708 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 8-11 * column 1, paragraphs 1,2 * * column 3, line 4 - line 19; figures 2,3 * |