Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1050644

EP1050644 - Vehicle door handle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.12.2006
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.12.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.01.2007  [2007/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Valeo Sicurezza Abitacolo S.p.A.
Via Asti 89
10026 Santena (TO) / IT
[2001/18]
Former [2000/45]For all designated states
Valeo Sicurezza Abitacolo
Via Asti 89
10026 Santena (TO) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Josserand, Luc
Via XX Settembre, 58
10121 Torino / IT
02 / Savant, Fiorenzo
Via Vacchieri, 3
10093 Collegno / IT
[2000/45]
Representative(s)Rosolen-Delarue, Katell
Valeo Securité Habitacle
Service Propriété Industrielle
42 Rue Le Corbusier
Europarc
94042 Créteil Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2004/40]Rosolen-Delarue, Katell
Valeo Securité Habitacle, Service Propriété Industrielle, 42, rue Le Corbusier - Europarc
94042 Creteil Cedex / FR
Former [2003/49]Hervouet, Sylvie , et al
Valeo Sécurité Habitacle S.A.S. Service Propriété Industrielle 42, rue Le Corbusier Europarc
94042 Créteil Cedex / FR
Former [2002/26]Croonenbroek, Thomas , et al
Valeo Securité Habitacle, 42, rue Le Corbusier, Europarc
94042 Créteil Cedex / FR
Former [2000/45]Cerbaro, Elena, Dr. , et al
STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date00109651.005.05.2000
[2000/45]
Priority number, dateIT1999TO0037907.05.1999         Original published format: IT TO990379
[2000/45]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1050644
Date:08.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1050644
Date:21.03.2001
[2001/12]
Type: A9 Corrected patent application 
No.:EP1050644
Date:02.05.2001
[N/P]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1050644
Date:15.02.2006
Language:EN
[2006/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:E05B65/20, E05B7/00, E05B65/12
[2000/45]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [2001/50]
Former [2000/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kraftfahrzeugtürgriff[2000/45]
English:Vehicle door handle[2000/45]
French:Poignée de porte de véhicule automobile[2000/45]
Examination procedure17.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/46]
09.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.12.2005Fee for grant paid
12.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.11.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
02.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
01.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US3719248  (BREITSCHWERDT W, et al) [X] 1,3-5 * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 62; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US3583741  (BREITSCHWERDT WERNER, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *