Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1052391

EP1052391 - Compression self-igniting gasoline engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.03.2005
Database last updated on 20.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.04.2005  [2005/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
No.2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama city, Kanagawa / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
No.2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama city, Kanagawa / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Urushihara, Tomonori
19-20, Yanagi-cho, Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama City, Kanagawa / JP
02 / Hiraya, Koji
68-E104, Oppamahigashi-cho, 3-chome
Yokosuka city, Kanagawa / JP
03 / Hasegawa, Kazuya
68-E114, Oppomahigashi-cho, 3-chome
Yokosuka City, Kanagawa / JP
04 / Naitoh, Ken
2-203,4-34 Narushima-machi 1-chome
Yonezawa City, Yamagata / JP
05 / Taniyama, Tsuyoshi
68-E-412, Oppamahigashi-cho, 3-chome
Yokosuka city, Kanagawa / JP
06 / Iiyama, Akihiro
9-2, Zushi 7-chome
Zushi city, Kanagawa / JP
[2001/01]
Former [2000/46]01 / Urushihara, Tomonori
19-20, Yanagi-cho, Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama City, Kanagawa / JP
02 / Hiraya, Koji
68-E104, Oppamahigashi-cho, 3-chome
Yokosuka city, Kanagawa / JP
03 / Hasegawa, Kazuya
68-E114, Oppomahigashi-cho, 3-chome
Yokosuka City, Kanagawa / JP
04 / Naitoh, Ken
2-203,4-34 Narushima-machi 1-chome
Yokohama city, Kamagata / JP
05 / Taniyama, Tsuyoshi
68-E-412, Oppamahigashi-cho, 3-chome
Yokosuka city, Kanagawa / JP
06 / Iiyama, Akihiro
9-2, Zushi 7-chome
Zushi city, Kanagawa / JP
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00109801.109.05.2000
[2000/46]
Priority number, dateJP1999013167112.05.1999         Original published format: JP 13167199
JP1999017275218.06.1999         Original published format: JP 17275299
[2000/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1052391
Date:15.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1052391
Date:24.01.2001
[2001/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1052391
Date:28.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:F02D41/38, F02D13/02, F02M25/07, F02D21/08, F02D41/40
[2001/04]
Former International [2000/46]F02D41/38, F02D13/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/41]
Former [2000/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Selbstgezündete Brennkraftmaschine[2000/46]
English:Compression self-igniting gasoline engine[2000/46]
French:Moteur à auto-allumage[2000/46]
Examination procedure09.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
02.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2004Fee for grant paid
27.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[PX]JPH11324778  ;
 [A]US5517954  (MELCHIOR JEAN F [FR]) [A] 1 * column 9, line 50 - column 10, line 29 *;
 [PA]EP0943793  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [PA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5746163  (GREEN EDWARD [US])
 [PX]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000229), vol. 2000, no. 02, [PX] 1 * abstract *
by applicantJPH07332141