EP1063162 - Motor assisted bicycle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2002 [2002/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Buchner, Johannes Unteraumühlweg 8 5400 Hallein / AT | [2000/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/52] | Application number, filing date | 00109942.3 | 11.05.2000 | [2000/52] | Priority number, date | AT19990001109 | 24.06.1999 Original published format: AT 110999 | [2000/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1063162 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B62M23/02 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
B62M6/65 (EP,US);
B60L50/20 (EP,US);
B60L2200/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/37] |
Former [2000/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Antriebsvorrichtung für ein Fahrrad | [2000/52] | English: | Motor assisted bicycle | [2000/52] | French: | Bicyclette à assistance électrique | [2000/52] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/14] | 26.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.08.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.08.2001 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]FR875752 (MAGNETOS R B SOC D) [DA] 1 * page 1, line 30 - line 34 *; | [DA]FR878837 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]US4267898 (WHEATON GEORGE B) [DA] 1 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 39 *; | [DA]GB2164615 (CAMPOPIANO FELICE) [DA] 1* page 1, line 51 - line 53 * | by applicant | FR875752 | FR878837 | US4267898 | GB2164615 |