Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1052001

EP1052001 - Video game device, character growth control method for video game and readable storage medium storing growth control program [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  17.03.2006
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.03.2006Refusal of applicationpublished on 03.05.2006  [2006/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Konami Co., Ltd.
3-1, Toranomon 4-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2000/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Kondo, Tetsuya
3-1-632, Jingu 6-chome
Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP
02 / Nakagawa, Eiji
115-7-201, Kakogawachomizonokuchi
Kakogawa-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP
03 / Hiromi, Akinori
5-4, Minamieganosho 6-chome
Habikino-shi, Osafa-fu / JP
[2000/46]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date00110175.715.05.2000
[2000/46]
Priority number, dateJP1999013335613.05.1999         Original published format: JP 13335699
[2000/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1052001
Date:15.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1052001
Date:17.01.2001
[2001/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:A63F13/10
[2000/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/40]
Former [2000/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Videospielvorrichtung, Charakterentwicklungskontrollverfahren für Videospiel und entsprechendes Aufzeichungsmedium[2000/46]
English:Video game device, character growth control method for video game and readable storage medium storing growth control program[2000/46]
French:Appareil de jeu vidéo, méthode de contrôle de développement d'un charactère pour jeu vidéo et support d'enregistrement correspondant[2000/46]
Examination procedure22.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/20]
18.07.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
18.07.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
18.07.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FI, GR
08.11.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
20.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2005Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/18]
24.10.2005Date of oral proceedings
29.11.2005Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/18]
29.11.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
30.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.08.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5885156  (TOYOHARA KOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10,12,13,17-19 * column 2, line 30 - line 58 * * column 7, line 36 - line 45 * * column 11, line 21 - line 26 * * column 11, line 48 - column 12, line 6 *;
 [A]EP0768105  (KONAMI CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10,18,19 * column 12, line 51 - column 13, line 33 *
 [A]  TIM CHOWN, "Premier Manager 97", [ONLINE], (199705), pages 1 - 8, XP002115838 [A] 1,10,18,19 * page 4, paragraph 3 *
 [A]  TIM CHOWN, "Championship Manager 3", [ONLINE], (199904), pages 1 - 5, URL: www.gamesdomain.co.uk/gdreview/zones/reviews/pc/apr99/cm3_prnt.html;, (20001117), XP002153214 [A] 1,18,19 * page 2, paragraph 5 *