EP1057822 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF ALCOHOL DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/49] | Process for preparing alcohol derivatives | ||
[2002/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayaba-cho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/07] | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | ||
Former [2000/49] | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uno, Mitsuru c/o Kao Corporation, Res. Lab., 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | 02 /
Okutsu, Munehisa c/o Kao Corporation, Res. Lab., 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | 03 /
Kitsuki, Tomohito c/o Kao Corporation, Res. Lab., 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | [2000/49] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00110209.4 | 17.05.2000 | [2000/49] | Priority number, date | JP19990153850 | 01.06.1999 Original published format: JP 15385099 | [2000/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1057822 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1057822 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | [2000/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1057822 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07D303/22, C07D301/28, C07B41/00, C07H1/00 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
C07D303/22 (EP,US);
C07B41/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/36] |
Former [2000/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ALKOHOLDERIVATEN | [2002/30] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF ALCOHOL DERIVATIVES | [2002/30] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LA PREPARATION DE DERIVES D' ALCOOLS | [2002/30] |
Former [2000/49] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Alkoholderivaten | ||
Former [2000/49] | Process for preparing alcohol derivatives | ||
Former [2000/49] | Procédé pour la préparation de dérivés d'alcools | Examination procedure | 23.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 25.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]EP0980869 (KAO CORP [JP]) [PA] 1 * example -; claim - *; | [DA]WO9850389 (KAO CORP [JP], et al); | [A]US4721816 (EDWARDS CHARLES L [US]) [A] 1 * example -; claim - *; | [DA]JPS62164641 (SHELL INT RESEARCH) |