Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1055629

EP1055629 - Yarn supply system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.06.2004
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.07.2004  [2004/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IROPA AG
Oberneuhofstrasse 6
6340 Baar / CH
[2002/03]
Former [2001/48]For all designated states
IROPA AG
Oberneuhofstrasse 6
6341 Baar / CH
Former [2000/48]For all designated states
IRO Patent AG
Oberneuhofstrasse 6
6340 Baar / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Tholander, Lars Helge Gottfrid
Haversdalsvägen 47
310 42 Haverdal / SE
[2000/48]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00110457.916.05.2000
[2000/48]
Priority number, dateSE1999000016327.05.1999         Original published format: SE 9900163
[2000/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1055629
Date:29.11.2000
Language:DE
[2000/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1055629
Date:16.05.2001
[2001/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1055629
Date:06.08.2003
Language:DE
[2003/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:B65H51/32, B65H51/22, D03D47/36, D04B15/48
[2000/48]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   IT,   LI,   NL [2002/07]
Former [2000/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Fadenliefersystem[2000/48]
English:Yarn supply system[2000/48]
French:Système d'alimentation en fil textile[2000/48]
Examination procedure15.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/02]
17.11.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
02.04.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE
28.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.06.2003Fee for grant paid
02.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.01.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DA]WO9419861  (IRO AB [SE], et al) [DA] 1 * figure -; claims 5,6 *;
 [A]US3994447  (SARFATI ALBERTO GUSTAVO, et al)