Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1028094

EP1028094 - Lithium ion conductive glass-ceramics and electric cells and gas sensors using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/33]Alkali ion conductive glass-ceramics and electric cells and gas sensors using the same
[2002/46]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.03.2004
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.05.2004  [2004/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA OHARA
1-15-30, Oyama, Sagamihara-shi
Kanagawa-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/33]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA OHARA
1-15-30, Oyama, Sagamihara-shi
Kanagawa-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Fu, Jie, c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Ohara
1-15-30, Oyama
Sagmihara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[2000/33]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/33]Jönsson, Hans-Peter, Dr.Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus am Dom)
50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date00110476.920.06.1997
[2000/33]
Priority number, dateJP1997003830306.02.1997         Original published format: JP 3830397
[2000/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1028094
Date:16.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1028094
Date:20.09.2000
[2000/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1028094
Date:21.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP09.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:C03C4/14, C03C10/00, H01M10/36
[2000/33]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/33]
TitleGerman:Lithium-Ionen leitende Glaskeramiken und damit hergestellte elektrische Zellen und Gassensoren[2002/46]
English:Lithium ion conductive glass-ceramics and electric cells and gas sensors using the same[2002/46]
French:Vitro-céramiques conducteurs d'ions de lithium, cellules électriques et senseurs de gaz utilisant ces vitro-céramiques[2002/46]
Former [2000/33]Alkali-Ionen leitende Glaskeramiken und damit hergestellte elektrische Zellen und Gassensoren
Former [2000/33]Alkali ion conductive glass-ceramics and electric cells and gas sensors using the same
Former [2000/33]Vitro-céramiques conducteurs d'ions d'alcalin, cellules électriques et senseurs de gaz utilisant ces vitro-céramiques
Examination procedure17.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/33]
27.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.02.2003Fee for grant paid
13.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP97110106.8  / EP0857699
Opposition(s)24.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
15.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
25.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US4985317  (ADACHI GINYA [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,8,11 * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 14 * * figure -; examples 4-6,10; claim - *;
 [Y]EP0718247  (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [Y] 13 * claim - *;
 [A]JPH02302307  ;
 JPH02302307  [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD)
 [XY]  MIN J R ET AL, "THE EFFECTS OF MIXED GLASS FORMERS IN THE PROPERTIES OF NON-CRYSTALLINE LITHIUM ION CONDUCTORS", PHYSICA STATUS SOLIDI (A). APPLIED RESEARCH,DE,BERLIN, (1995), vol. 148, no. 2, ISSN 0031-8965, pages 383 - 388, XP002057134 [X] 1,7-12 * page 383 * * examples B2-C1; table 1 * * figure 2B * [Y] 13
 [A]  1, vol. 1991, no. 05, Database accession no. 1991-032877, XP002057135 [A] 1-12 * abstract *