blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1055932


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.06.2004 Withdrawal of application published on  11.08.2004  [2004/33]
02.06.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.02.2004 Publication of search report published on  31.03.2004  [2004/14]
06.06.2003 Renewal fee
05.06.2002 Renewal fee
13.10.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.11.2000 [2000/48]