blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1055932
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3908476BGlobal Dossier 25.04.2007B2
JP2001349920 21.12.2001A
Priority number Date
JP2001111456 10.04.2001
JP14297199 24.05.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100417095BGlobal Dossier 05.02.2004B1
KR20000076607 26.12.2000A
Priority number Date
JP14297199 24.05.1999
JP34738699 07.12.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP3285568BGlobal Dossier 27.05.2002B2
JP2001041994 16.02.2001A
Priority number Date
JP14297199 24.05.1999
JP34738699 07.12.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1055932Global Dossier 31.03.2004A3
EP1055932 29.11.2000A2
Priority number Date
JP14297199 24.05.1999
JP34738699 07.12.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW586010B 01.05.2004B
Priority number Date
JP14297199 24.05.1999
JP34738699 07.12.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6459272 01.10.2002B1
Priority number Date
JP14297199 24.05.1999
JP34738699 07.12.1999