Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1055932

EP1055932 - Apparatus and method for inspecting wiring on board [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  25.06.2004
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.2004Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 11.08.2004  [2004/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nidec-Read Corporation
126, Megawa, Makishima-cho Uji-city
Kyoto 611-0041 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]For all designated states
Nidec-Read Corporation
126, Megawa, Makishima-cho
Uji-city, Kyoto 611-0041 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamashita, Munehiro
c/o Nidec-Read Corp., 126, Megawa, Makishima-cho
Uji-City, Kyoto 611-0041 / JP
[2000/48]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date00110909.924.05.2000
[2000/48]
Priority number, dateJP1999014297124.05.1999         Original published format: JP 14297199
JP1999034738607.12.1999         Original published format: JP 34738699
[2000/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1055932
Date:29.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1055932
Date:31.03.2004
[2004/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.02.2004
ClassificationInternational:G01R31/28
[2000/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/48]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Prüfen der Leiter auf einer Leiterplatte[2000/48]
English:Apparatus and method for inspecting wiring on board[2000/48]
French:Dispositif et procédé d'inspection des conducteurs d'un circuit imprimé[2000/48]
Examination procedure22.06.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
19.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPS63186211  ;
 [Y]US5578930  (SHEEN TIMOTHY W [US]) [Y] 10,14-16,20,21,24 * column 3, line 33 - line 55; figure 1 * * column 5, line 21 - line 55 *;
 [A]EP0678750  (KLEINDIENST DATENTECH GMBH [DE]) [A] 11-13 * column 1, line 48 - line 57 * * column 2, line 12 - line 14 * * column 2, line 46 - line 52; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5631572  (SHEEN TIMOTHY W [US], et al) [A] 11-13 * column 3, line 52 - line 59; figure 1 * * column 4, line 48 - line 53 * * column 10, line 48 - line 50 *;
 [A]US5517110  (SOIFERMAN JACOB [CA]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 13 - line 20; figure 4 * * column 5, line 46 - column 6, line 3 *
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881206), vol. 012, no. 463, Database accession no. (P - 796), [X] 1-9,11-13,17-19,22,23,25 * abstract * [Y] 10,14-16,20,21,24