Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1072722

EP1072722 - Dryer section [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.10.2005
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.11.2005  [2005/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Voith Paper Patent GmbH
Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2001/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Wolf, Robert
Elchweg 18
89542 Herbrechtingen / DE
02 / Oechsle, Markus
Falkenbergweg 23
73566 Bartholomae / DE
03 / Mayer, Wolfgang
Uracher Weg 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
04 / Chau-Huu, Tri
Haller Weg 37
89522 Heidenheim / DE
05 / Mack, Thomas
Sonnenhalde 1
89567 Sontheim / DE
06 / Mayer, Roland
Robert-Koch-Strasse 60
89522 Heidenheim / DE
 [2001/05]
Application number, filing date00111225.925.05.2000
[2001/05]
Priority number, dateDE199913513827.07.1999         Original published format: DE 19935138
[2001/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1072722
Date:31.01.2001
Language:DE
[2001/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1072722
Date:09.05.2001
[2001/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1072722
Date:01.12.2004
Language:DE
[2004/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:D21F5/00, D21F5/18
[2001/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   SE [2002/05]
Former [2001/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Trockenpartie[2001/05]
English:Dryer section[2001/05]
French:Section de séchage[2001/05]
Examination procedure09.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/02]
17.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.2004Fee for grant paid
30.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
02.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
01.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[E]WO0100925  (VALMET KARLSTAD AB [SE]) [E] 1-3,5,20 * page 8, line 19 - page 15, line 8; figure - *;
 [A]US5865955  (ILVESPAEAE HEIKKI [FI], et al) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *;
 [A]EP0620313  (VALMET PAPER MACHINERY INC [FI]) [A] 1 * figure - *