Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1055886

EP1055886 - Control device of air conditioning system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/48]Control device of air contitioning system
[2005/25]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.01.2006
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2000/48]For all designated states
Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Inoue, Yuji
2-3-1-1, Noji-cho
Kusatsu-shi, Shiga, 525-8620 / JP
[2000/48]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00111291.125.05.2000
[2000/48]
Priority number, dateJP1999014447825.05.1999         Original published format: JP 14447899
[2000/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1055886
Date:29.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1055886
Date:15.05.2002
[2002/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1055886
Date:02.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/09]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP1055886
Date:17.08.2005
[2005/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP28.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:F24F11/00, G05D27/02
[2000/48]
Designated contracting statesES,   GR,   IT [2003/06]
Former [2000/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Regelungseinrichtung für eine Klimaanlage[2000/48]
English:Control device of air conditioning system[2005/32]
French:Dispositif de commande pour un système de conditionnement d'air[2000/48]
Former [2000/48]Control device of air contitioning system
Examination procedure02.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
26.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.12.2004Fee for grant paid
23.12.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
28.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US4522255  (BAKER GARY C [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 4,7 *;
 [A]JPH102590  ;
 [A]JPH0422307  ;
 [A]JPH06229608  ;
 [A]JPH09318135  ;
 [A]US4779671  (DOLISON DEWEY [US]);
 [A]US4966009  (ISHII KATSUSHI [JP], et al);
 [A]JPH10110995
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 05, [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920430), vol. 016, no. 180, Database accession no. (C - 0935), [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941121), vol. 018, no. 611, Database accession no. (M - 1708), [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980331), vol. 1998, no. 04, [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 1998, no. 09, [A] * abstract *
by applicantJPS6029855