Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1056204

EP1056204 - Tunable RF filter with image trap [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.04.2004
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.06.2004  [2004/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pioneer Corporation
4-1, Meguro 1-chome
Meguro-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]For all designated states
Pioneer Corporation
4-1 Meguro 1-chome
Meguro-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kosuga, Tadashi, c/o Pioneer Corp., Kawagoe Works
No. 25-1 Aza-Nishicho, Oaza-Yamada
Kawagoe-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
[2000/48]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstraße 14
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Application number, filing date00111308.325.05.2000
[2000/48]
Priority number, dateJP1999014504325.05.1999         Original published format: JP 14504399
[2000/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1056204
Date:29.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:H03J3/18
[2000/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/33]
Former [2000/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Abstimmbarer HF-Filter mit einem Spiegelfrequenzsperrkreis[2000/48]
English:Tunable RF filter with image trap[2000/48]
French:Filtre accordable HF comportant un circuit bouchon de fréquence image[2000/48]
Examination procedure28.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/31]
17.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/24]
07.01.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3705932  (TELEFUNKEN ELECTRONIC GMBH) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 22 - line 28 *;
 [A]US5392011  (LI RICHARD C [US]) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 33 - line 58 *;
 [A]US3646449  (HELIBARTH HEINZ, et al) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 1 - line 9 *;
 [A]EP0318118  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-3 * figure 2 *;
 [A]US5065453  (THOMAS GARY D [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 5, line 32 - line 60; figure 2 * * column 6, line 61 - line 65 *;
 [A]US5019910  (FILMER DONALD D [CA]) [A] 2 * column 18, line 53 - column 19, line 2; figure 7 *;
 [A]EP0736971  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [FR], et al)