EP1065158 - Conveyor belt scraper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.2005 [2005/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Tsusho Kabushiki Kaisha 8-10, Iwamoto-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states Nippon Tsusho Kabushiki Kaisha 8-10, Iwamoto-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshizako, Kageyoshi No. 2-11-13 Shirasagi-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Uchida, Masahiro No. 3-52-12 Oikedai Sakai-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Fujisaki, Nobuyoshi 402 Asashio-corp., No. 2-8-21 Tanaka, Minato-ku Osaka-shi / JP | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | Hering, Hartmut, et al Patentanwälte Berendt, Leyh & Hering Innere Wiener Strasse 20 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | Hering, Hartmut, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Berendt, Leyh & Hering Innere Wiener Strasse 20 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00111488.3 | 29.05.2000 | [2001/01] | Priority number, date | JP19990181412 | 28.06.1999 Original published format: JP 18141299 | [2001/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1065158 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1065158 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65G45/16 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
B65G45/12 (EP,US);
B65G45/14 (KR);
B08B1/165 (KR);
B08B1/20 (KR);
B08B1/30 (KR);
B65G45/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/38] |
Former [2001/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Förderbandabstreicher | [2001/01] | English: | Conveyor belt scraper | [2001/01] | French: | Racloir d'une bande transporteuse | [2001/01] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/11] | 21.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2040249 (SALGAR SUPPLIES) [A] 1* page 5, line 19 - page 9, line 5 *; | [Y]EP0486112 (HORYO CORP [JP]) [Y] 1 * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 32; figures 4-6 *; | [Y]WO9304959 (DOLAN TROY D [US]) [Y] 1 * page 1, line 124 - page 3, line 13; figure 2 * |