EP1160518 - Humidifier with surface evaporation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heinz Schilling KG Möhlenring 53 47906 Kempen / DE | [2001/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schilling, Heinz Möhlenring 53 47906 Kempen / DE | 02 /
Bongartz, Werner Magdeburger Strasse 10 47906 Kempen / DE | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wissgott Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | COHAUSZ DAWIDOWICZ HANNIG & SOZIEN Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2001/49] | COHAUSZ HANNIG DAWIDOWICZ & PARTNER Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 00111595.5 | 31.05.2000 | [2001/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1160518 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1160518 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F24F6/04 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
F24F6/04 (EP);
F24F8/117 (EP);
Y02A50/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, LI, LU [2002/35] |
Former [2001/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Oberflächen-Verdunstungsbefeuchter | [2001/49] | English: | Humidifier with surface evaporation | [2001/49] | French: | Humidificateur à évaporation sur une surface | [2001/49] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/23] | 06.06.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.09.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, MC, NL, PT, SE | 26.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.07.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   04.06.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11316035 ; | [Y]US2522600 (BROOKINS RICHARD N) [Y] 13,17-19 * column 3, line 44 - column 5, line 13 * * figures 1-8 *; | [Y]US2856166 (GOETTL ALBERT B) [Y] 5,7 * column 2, line 22 - line 29 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB937830 (RODERICK ERNEST WALLINGTON BUT) [A] 1,24,25 * figure 1 *; | [X]DE1501278 (LAING NIKOLAUS) [X] 1,2 * page 5, line 23 - page 6, line 3 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US4200599 (GOETTL ADAM D [US]) [A] 13,17-19 * figures 2A,3,5 *; | [A]US4312819 (LEYLAND BILLY M) [A] 1,24,26 * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE3143443 (ANDRADE SAMUEL REBELO DE [DE]) [Y] 14 * page 13, paragraph 2 *; | [A]US4389352 (BOHANON SR HOY R) [A] 13,14,17,20 * figures 1-3F *; | [XAY]US4612778 (MEDRANO MICHAEL V [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6,11,14,17,19,22 * abstract * * column 4, line 30 - line 32 * * figure 6 * [A] 8,24,25 [Y] 5,7,10,13,14,16-19; | [A]US4657709 (GOETTL ADAM D [US]) [A] 15,17* figures 2-5 *; | [Y]EP0334017 (BENTZ & SOHN MELITTA [DE]) [Y] 16 * column 4, line 2 - line 25 *; | [Y]CH687417 (SCHONMANN WILFRED E [CH]) [Y] 10 * column 1, line 46 - line 54 * * figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000229), vol. 2000, no. 02, & JP11316035 A 19991116 (KIMURA KOHKI CO LTD) [A] 1,9 * abstract * |