Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1058119

EP1058119 - Compact wheel speed detector capable of saving space and improving workability [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.09.2010
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 31.08.2011  [2011/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JTEKT Corporation
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 542-8502 / JP
[2009/47]
Former [2006/23]For all designated states
JTEKT Corporation
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka
542-8502 / JP
Former [2000/49]For all designated states
KOYO SEIKO CO., LTD.
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka 542-0081 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sentoku, Minoru
c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 542-8502 / JP
02 / Kawamura, Motoshi
c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 542-8502 / JP
03 / Toda, Kazutoshi
c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 542-8502 / JP
04 / Seo, Noboyuki
c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 542-8502 / JP
05 / Morimura, Naoki
c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 542-8502 / JP
06 / Ishii, Tomohiro
c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 542-8502 / JP
07 / Kouda, Kanichi
c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 542-8502 / JP
08 / Shige, Yoshifumi
c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 542-8502 / JP
09 / Harumi, Fujio
c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 542-8502 / JP
 [2009/45]
Former [2000/49]01 / Sentoku, Minoru, c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd.
No. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka 542-0081 / JP
02 / Kawamura, Motoshi, c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd.
No. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka 542-0081 / JP
03 / Toda, Kazutoshi, c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd.
No. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka 542-0081 / JP
04 / Seo, Noboyuki, c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd.
No. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka 542-0081 / JP
05 / Morimura, Naoki, c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd.
No. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka 542-0081 / JP
06 / Ishii, Tomohiro, c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd.
No. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka 542-0081 / JP
07 / Kouda, Kanichi, c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd.
No. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka 542-0081 / JP
08 / Shige, Yoshifumi, c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd.
No. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka 542-0081 / JP
09 / Harumi, Fujio, c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd.
No. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka 542-0081 / JP
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/15]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2009/29]Selting, Günther , et al
Patentanwälte Von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Former [2000/49]Selting, Günther , et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Deichmannhaus Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date00111626.831.05.2000
[2000/49]
Priority number, dateJP1999015496402.06.1999         Original published format: JP 15496499
[2000/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1058119
Date:06.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1058119
Date:02.05.2001
[2001/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1058119
Date:18.11.2009
Language:EN
[2009/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP22.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:G01P3/44, G01P3/487, G01P1/00
[2000/49]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/04]
Former [2000/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Platzsparender, kompakter Raddrehzahlsensor mit verbesserter Verarbeitbarkeit[2000/49]
English:Compact wheel speed detector capable of saving space and improving workability[2000/49]
French:Capteur compact de rotation d'une roue, d'encombrement réduit et d'usinage amélioré[2000/49]
Examination procedure08.08.2001Examination requested  [2001/40]
03.11.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
19.03.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
04.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.05.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.2009Fee for grant paid
23.09.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP06016315.1  / EP1722237
EP09174058.9  / EP2146211
Opposition(s)19.08.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
27.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
30.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
30.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
27.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
27.12.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB31.05.2010
[2011/35]
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0378939  (ROULEMENTS SOC NOUVELLE [FR]) [X] 1-6,8,13,16,17 * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 32; figures 1-4 * [Y] 9-12,14;
 [X]EP0371836  (ROULEMENTS SOC NOUVELLE [FR]) [X] 1-6,8,18,20-22 * column 1, line 27 - line 40 * * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 10; figures 2,3 *;
 [XA]EP0520853  (ROULEMENTS SOC NOUVELLE [FR]) [X] 1,7 * column 2, line 20 - column 4, line 20; figure 1 * [A] 19;
 [X]EP0872652  (SKF FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1-6,15,20 * column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 46; figure 4 *;
 [Y]US5407213  (OUCHI HIDEO [JP], et al) [Y] 9-12,14 * column 3, line 56 - column 5, line 3; figure 4 *
ExaminationEP0521789