Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1065366

EP1065366 - Snap-lock retainer for a fuel injector [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.03.2005
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.04.2005  [2005/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens VDO Automotive Corporation
2400 Executive Hills Drive
Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2980 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/17]For all designated states
Siemens VDO Automotive Corporation
2400 Executive Hills Drive
Auburn Hills, Michigan 48326-2980 / US
Former [2001/01]For all designated states
Siemens Automotive Corporation
2400 Executive Hills Drive
Auburn Hills, Michigan 48326-2980 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Leung, Johnny
1478 Berkshire Drive
Newport News, VA 23602 / US
[2001/01]
Representative(s)Morgan, Marc
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/01]Morgan, Marc
Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34
80506 Munich / DE
Former [2001/01]Allen, Derek
Siemens Shared Services Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Siemens House, Oldbury
Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB
Application number, filing date00112022.902.06.2000
[2001/01]
Priority number, dateUS1999034375430.06.1999         Original published format: US 343754
[2001/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1065366
Date:03.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1065366
Date:26.03.2003
[2003/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP06.02.2003
ClassificationInternational:F02M61/16, F02M55/00
[2003/13]
Former International [2001/01]F02M55/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/51]
Former [2001/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schnappverschlusshalterung für ein Brennstoffeinspritzventil[2001/01]
English:Snap-lock retainer for a fuel injector[2001/01]
French:Dispositif de retention à verrouillage à cliquet pour un injecteur de carburant[2001/01]
Examination procedure07.03.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.05.2003Examination requested  [2003/27]
27.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/16]
17.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200405   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE4131537  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,3,6-8 * column 3, line 11 - line 33 * * column 3, line 44 - line 58; figure 1 * [A] 10;
 [XA]DE2908095  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [X] 1,3,4,6,8 * page 7, paragraph 1; figure 1 * [A] 10;
 [A]WO9827334  (SIEMENS AUTOMOTIVE CORP LP [US]) [A] 1-3,6,10 * page 5, line 21 - line 28; figure 4 *;
 [A]US5301647  (LORRAINE JACK R [US]) [A] 1,4-8,10 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 26; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US5092300  (IMOEHL WILLIAM J [US], et al) [A] 1,6-8 * column 3, line 41 - line 55; figure 6 *