Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1035095

EP1035095 - Method for making 1,2-Dibromoindane [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.12.2001
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.01.2002  [2002/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ICHIKAWA GOSEI CHEMICAL CO., LTD.
1-133, Aza Ohtsurugi, Shimokawa, Izumi-machi Iwaki-shi
Fukushima-ken 970-04 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
Ichikawa Gosei Chemical Co., Ltd.
1-133, Aza Ohtsurugi, Shimokawa, Izumi-machi
Iwaki-shi, Fukushima-ken 970-04 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Igarashi, Yoshio, Ichikawa Gosei Chem. Co., Ltd.
1-133, Aza Ohtsurugi, Shimokawa, Izumi-machi
Iwaki-shi, Fukushima-ken 970-04 / JP
02 / Nakano, Shigeru, Ichikawa Gosei Chemical Co., Ltd.
1-133, Aza Ohtsurugi, Shimokawa, Izumi-machi
Iwaki-shi, Fukushima-ken 970-04 / JP
03 / Konno, Yuzi, Ichikawa Gosei Chemical Co., Ltd.
1-133, Aza Ohtsurugi, Shimokawa, Izumi-machi
Iwaki-shi, Fukushima-ken 970-04 / JP
04 / Asano, Fumihiro, Ichikawa Gosei Chemical Co., Ltd.
1-133, Aza Ohtsurugi, Shimokawa, Izumi-machi
Iwaki-shi, Fukushima-ken 970-04 / JP
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Hirsch & Associés
137, rue de l'Université
75007 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]Cabinet Hirsch
34, Rue de Bassano
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date00112111.013.03.1996
[2000/37]
Priority number, dateJP1995005421314.03.1995         Original published format: JP 5421395
[2000/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1035095
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07C23/18, C07C17/02
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT [2000/37]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von 1,2-Dibromindan[2000/37]
English:Method for making 1,2-Dibromoindane[2000/37]
French:Procédé pour la préparation de 1,2-dibromoindane[2000/37]
Examination procedure30.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/10]
14.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.07.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/05]
29.08.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/05]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96905997.1  / EP0816317
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
06.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
06.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]  - HO, TSE-LOK ET AL, "Synthetic methods and reactions;39. Phase transfer catalyst promoted halogenation of alkenes with hydrohalic acid/hydrogen peroxide", SYNTHESIS (1977), (10), 676-7, (1977), XP002142447 [A] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-1977-24526
 [A]  - BILLUPS, W. E. ET AL, "Generation of 2-chloronaphthalene-1,3-diyl", J. ORG. CHEM. (1980), 45(23), 4636-41, (1980), XP002142448 [A] 1 * page 4638, column 2 - page 4639, column 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo01311a017
 [DA]  - HEASLEY, GENE E. ET AL, "Electrophilic additions to indene and indenone: factors effecting syn addition", J. ORG. CHEM. (1980), 45(25), 5150-5, (1980), XP002142449 [DA] 1 * page 5150 - page 5152 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo01313a025