Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1059638

EP1059638 - Disk storage case [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.09.2006
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2007Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 07.11.2007  [2007/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TDK Corporation
13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/47]For all designated states
TDK Corporation
13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2000/50]For all designated states
TDK Corporation
13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ikebe, Masaru, c/o TDK Corporation
13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Miyazaki, Yukio, c/o TDK Corporation
13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2000/50]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/50]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00112259.707.06.2000
[2000/50]
Priority number, dateJP1999016098608.06.1999         Original published format: JP 16098699
[2000/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1059638
Date:13.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1059638
Date:11.04.2001
[2001/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1059638
Date:23.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP26.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:G11B23/03, G11B23/033, G11B33/04
[2000/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/01]
Former [2000/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Plattenbehälter[2000/50]
English:Disk storage case[2000/50]
French:Cassette pour disques[2000/50]
Examination procedure30.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/39]
20.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2005Fee for grant paid
27.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
29.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2007/45]
Former [2007/35]IT23.11.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]US5682991  (LAMMERANT HENRI [BE], et al) [A] 1-6