EP1059795 - Telecommunication exchange [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tenovis GmbH & Co. KG Kleyerstrasse 94 60362 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | For all designated states Tenovis GmbH & Co. KG Kleyerstrasse 94 60362 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wiegand, Nicole Tevesstrasse 28 60326 Frankfurt / DE | 02 /
Stadler, Stephan Feldstrasse 31 63150 Heusenstamm / DE | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Walkenhorst, Andreas, et al Tergau & Walkenhorst Intellectual Property GmbH Lurgiallee 12 60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | Walkenhorst, Andreas, et al Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Eschersheimer Landstrasse 105-107 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2005/41] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2005/05] | Thul, Hermann, Dipl.-Phys. Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Allee 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2001/07] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2000/50] | Friedmann, Jürgen, Dr.-Ing., et al c/o Robert Bosch GmbH, Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 00112364.5 | 09.06.2000 | [2000/50] | Priority number, date | DE19991026434 | 10.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19926434 | [2000/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1059795 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1059795 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/42, H04M3/46 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
H04M3/465 (EP);
H04M3/46 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/50] | H04M3/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/50] | Title | German: | Telekommunikations-Vermittlungsanlage | [2000/50] | English: | Telecommunication exchange | [2000/50] | French: | Centrale de télécommunication | [2000/50] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 16.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/09] | 03.11.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/09] | Appeal following examination | 11.08.2006 | Appeal received No. T1798/06 | 19.10.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 03.11.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 03.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.11.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.11.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.08.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5815563 (ARDON MENACHEM TSUR [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 1, line 31 - line 39 * * column 2, line 8 - line 28 * * column 3, line 1 - line 7 * * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 8 * * column 4, line 22 - column 5, line 60; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US5802160 (KUGELL STANLEY [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 36 - column 2, line 6 * * column 2, line 23 - line 32 * * column 3, line 19 - line 48 * * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 29 * * column 9, line 8 - line 32 * * figures 2,4,5 *; | [A] - BOLTJES C J, "FACILITIES FOR USERS OF SOPHO-SET FEATURE PHONES", PHILIPS TELECOMMUNICATION REVIEW, PHILIPS TELECOMMUNICATIE INDUSTRIE N.V. HILVERSUM, NL, (19900301), vol. 48, no. 1, pages 20 - 27, XP000116333 [A] 1-5 * page 22, paragraph 4 * * page 24, paragraph 6.2 * * page 25, paragraph 8 * | [A] - ITU, "ITU-T I.252 - Call Offering supplementary services - ISDN", ITU-T STANDARD, (19890101), XP002202765 [A] 3,5 * page 260, paragraph 4.1 - page 263, paragraph 4.3.2.2.2 * |