Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1063250

EP1063250 - Water-dilutable resins, process for their preparation and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  14.09.2007
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cytec Surface Specialties Austria GmbH
Bundesstrasse 175
8402 Werndorf / AT
[2005/42]
Former [2003/33]For all designated states
Surface Specialties Austria GmbH
Bundesstrasse 175
8402 Werndorf / AT
Former [2003/30]For all designated states
Surface Specialities Austria GmbH
Bundesstrasse 175
8402 Werndorf / AT
Former [2001/01]For all designated states
Solutia Austria GmbH
Bundesstrasse 175
8402 Werndorf / AT
Former [2000/52]For all designated states
Vianova Resins AG
Bundesstrasse 175
8402 Werndorf / AT
Inventor(s)01 / Hobisch, Gerald, Dr.
Prof.F.-Spathring 25/21
8042 Graz / AT
02 / Tümmler, Peter, Dr.
Grillparzerstrasse 6
8010 Graz / AT
03 / Morre, Peter
Papiermühlgasse 21
8020 Graz / AT
[2000/52]
Representative(s)Deckers, Hellmuth Alexander
European Patent Attorney Breitbachstrasse 15
55218 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/02]Deckers, Hellmuth, Dr.
European Patent Attorney, Bahnhofstrasse 26/A
55218 Ingelheim / DE
Former [2003/23]Deckers, Hellmuth, Dr.
Patentanwaltskanzlei Zounek, Postfach 3540
65174 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [2000/52]Zounek, Nikolai, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwaltskanzlei Zounek, Industriepark Kalle Albert, Rheingaustrasse 190-196
65203 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date00112553.314.06.2000
[2000/52]
Priority number, dateAT1999000108321.06.1999         Original published format: AT 108399
[2000/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1063250
Date:27.12.2000
Language:DE
[2000/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1063250
Date:16.05.2001
[2001/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1063250
Date:25.02.2004
Language:DE
[2004/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:C08G18/54, C08G18/08, C09D17/00
[2000/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/52]
TitleGerman:Wasserverdünnbare Harze, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung[2000/52]
English:Water-dilutable resins, process for their preparation and their use[2000/52]
French:Résines diluables dans l'eau, procédé pour leur préparation et leur utilisation[2000/52]
Examination procedure16.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/03]
12.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.12.2003Fee for grant paid
04.12.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.11.2004   
Degussa AG
Paul-Baumann-Strasse 1
45764 Marl / DE
 [2005/03]
04.01.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.05.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.05.2005Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
05.07.2005Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
24.04.2007Date of oral proceedings
24.04.2007Legal effect of revocation of patent [2007/42]
29.05.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
29.05.2007Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY25.02.2004
FI25.02.2004
GB25.02.2004
IE25.02.2004
NL25.02.2004
DK25.05.2004
GR25.05.2004
SE25.05.2004
LU14.06.2004
BE30.06.2004
CH30.06.2004
LI30.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
PT25.07.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/08]CY25.02.2004
FI25.02.2004
GB25.02.2004
IE25.02.2004
NL25.02.2004
DK25.05.2004
GR25.05.2004
SE25.05.2004
LU14.06.2004
BE30.06.2004
CH30.06.2004
LI30.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
Former [2005/28]FI25.02.2004
GB25.02.2004
IE25.02.2004
NL25.02.2004
DK25.05.2004
GR25.05.2004
SE25.05.2004
LU14.06.2004
BE30.06.2004
CH30.06.2004
LI30.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
Former [2005/25]FI25.02.2004
GB25.02.2004
IE25.02.2004
NL25.02.2004
DK25.05.2004
GR25.05.2004
SE25.05.2004
LU14.06.2004
CH30.06.2004
LI30.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
Former [2005/23]FI25.02.2004
GB25.02.2004
IE25.02.2004
NL25.02.2004
DK25.05.2004
GR25.05.2004
SE25.05.2004
LU14.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
Former [2005/11]FI25.02.2004
GB25.02.2004
IE25.02.2004
NL25.02.2004
DK25.05.2004
GR25.05.2004
SE25.05.2004
MC30.06.2004
Former [2005/05]FI25.02.2004
GB25.02.2004
IE25.02.2004
NL25.02.2004
DK25.05.2004
GR25.05.2004
SE25.05.2004
Former [2005/03]FI25.02.2004
GB25.02.2004
IE25.02.2004
DK25.05.2004
GR25.05.2004
SE25.05.2004
Former [2005/02]FI25.02.2004
GB25.02.2004
DK25.05.2004
GR25.05.2004
SE25.05.2004
Former [2005/01]FI25.02.2004
GB25.02.2004
GR25.05.2004
SE25.05.2004
Former [2004/41]FI25.02.2004
GR25.05.2004
SE25.05.2004
Former [2004/40]FI25.02.2004
SE25.05.2004
Documents cited:Search[DXY]EP0838486  (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) [DX] 1-4,6-10 * page 2, line 47 - page 3, line 2 * * page 3, line 30 - page 3, line 35 * * page 3, line 51 - page 3, line 56; example .; claim - * [Y] 5;
 [Y]EP0827973  (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 5 * example -; claim - *