EP1061592 - Magneto-resistance effect element, and its use as memory element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2000/51] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Odagawa, Akihiro 3-10-7-404, Ayameikekita Nara-shi, Nara 631-0032 / JP | 02 /
Sakakima, Hiroshi 20-19, Kasumizaka Kyotanabe-shi, Kyoto 610-0352 / JP | 03 /
Hiramoto, Masayoshi 1863-2, Tawaraguchicho Ikoma-shi, Nara 630-0243 / JP | 04 /
Matsukawa, Nozomu 376, Tutuicho Yamatokoriyama-shi, Nara 639-1123 / JP | [2000/51] | Representative(s) | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | Kügele, Bernhard, et al NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL SA, 9, Rue du Valais 1202 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 00112886.7 | 19.06.2000 | [2000/51] | Priority number, date | JP19990170486 | 17.06.1999 Original published format: JP 17048699 | JP19990352962 | 13.12.1999 Original published format: JP 35296299 | [2000/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1061592 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1061592 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | [2001/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L43/08, H01F10/32, G11C11/16 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
H10N50/10 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y25/00 (EP,US);
G11B5/3909 (EP,US);
G11C11/16 (EP,US);
G11C11/161 (EP,US);
G11C11/1675 (EP,US);
G11C11/5607 (EP,US);
H01F10/3204 (EP,US);
H01F10/3254 (EP,US);
H01F10/3268 (EP,US);
H01F10/3272 (EP,US);
H10B61/00 (EP,US);
G11B2005/3996 (EP,US);
G11C2211/5615 (EP,US);
G11C2211/5616 (EP,US);
Y10S428/90 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1107 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1121 (EP,US);
Y10T428/26 (EP,US);
Y10T428/265 (EP,US);
Y10T428/32 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/24] |
Former [2000/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Magnetoresistives Element, und seine Verwendung als Speicherelement | [2000/51] | English: | Magneto-resistance effect element, and its use as memory element | [2000/51] | French: | Elément magnétorésistif et son utilisation comme élément de mémoire | [2000/51] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 15.06.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/52] | 11.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0714710 ; | [XY]EP0681338 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 88-94,97-100 * column W *[Y] 95,96,102,103; | [X]US5686838 (VAN DEN BERG HUGO [DE]) [X] 53,54 * column 10, line 22 - line 35; figure 5; claims 1,2,16,17 *; | [XY]EP0910092 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 76-79,82-85 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] * * paragraphs [0043] - [0055] * [Y] 80,81,86,87,95,96,102,103; | [PY]EP1003176 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [PY] 80,81,86,87 * paragraphs [0026] - [0047] *; | [XA] - SAKAKIMA H ET AL, "MAGNETORESISTANCE IN COMNB/CO(FE) /CU/CO(FE) SPIN-VALVES", JOURNAL OF MAGNETISM AND MAGNETIC MATERIALS,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, (1997), vol. 165, no. 1/03, ISSN 0304-8853, pages 108 - 110, XP000641747 [X] 1,4-7,50 * page 108 - page 109; figures 1,2 * * page 110, column 2, paragraph 3 * [A] 24,60 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-8853(96)00482-9 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950531), vol. 1995, no. 04, & JP07014710 A 19950117 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 53,54,58,66,67,71 * abstract * | [A] - LU Y ET AL, "BIAS VOLTAGE AND TEMPERATURE DEPENDENCE OF MAGNETOTUNNELING EFFECT", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK,US, (19980601), vol. 83, no. 11, PART 02, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 6515 - 6517, XP000777165 [A] 1,22,23,50,52,53,59 * page 6815, column 1, paragraph 3; figure 1A * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.367813 |