EP1074283 - A device for use in lotteries, promotions, gaming, amusement, education and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.04.2003 [2003/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCIENTIFIC GAMES INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 81 Kirkstall Road, Leeds West Yorkshire LS3 1LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/06] | For all designated states SCIENTIFIC GAMES INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 81 Kirkstall Road Leeds, West Yorkshire LS3 1LH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bedford, Jon, Scientific Games International Ltd. 81 Kirkstall Road Leeds, LS3 1LH / GB | [2001/06] | Representative(s) | Denmark, James Christopher Bailey Walsh & Co. 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/06] | Denmark, James Christopher Bailey Walsh & Co., 5 York Place Leeds, LS1 2SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00112975.8 | 21.06.2000 | [2001/06] | Priority number, date | GB19990018463 | 06.08.1999 Original published format: GB 9918463 | [2001/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1074283 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1074283 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A63F3/06, B42D15/00, G09F11/04, G09F11/23 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
A63F3/069 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/06] | A63F3/06, B42D15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/06] | Title | German: | Eine in Lotto, Reklame, Wette, Unterhaltung, Erziehung und ähnlichem verwendbare Vorrichtung | [2001/06] | English: | A device for use in lotteries, promotions, gaming, amusement, education and the like | [2001/06] | French: | Un dispositif utilisable dans les loteries, promotions, dispositifs de jeux, l'amusement, l'éducation ou analogue | [2001/06] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/14] | 31.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.08.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3471956 (WALTERS WILFRED C) [X] 1,10-12,14 * column W * [A] 16; | [A]US5447769 (BROMBERG HOWARD M [US]) [A] 1,2,16 * figure - * | by applicant | GB2324477 |