Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1065132

EP1065132 - Electric power steering apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.12.2005
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 18.11.2009  [2009/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd.
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/01]For all designated states
KOYO SEIKO CO., LTD.
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tsutsui, Takashi, c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd.
No. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-0081 / JP
02 / Watanabe, Masayuki, c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd.
No. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-0081 / JP
[2001/01]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/47]von Kirschbaum, Alexander , et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Former [2001/01]von Kirschbaum, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date00112999.821.06.2000
[2001/01]
Priority number, dateJP1999018252528.06.1999         Original published format: JP 18252599
[2001/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1065132
Date:03.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1065132
Date:09.02.2005
Language:EN
[2005/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:B62D5/04
[2001/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/38]
Former [2001/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektrische Servolenkung[2001/01]
English:Electric power steering apparatus[2001/01]
French:Direction assistée électrique[2001/01]
Examination procedure03.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/10]
17.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.12.2004Fee for grant paid
10.12.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.11.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT09.02.2005
[2007/35]
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9911502  (LUCAS IND PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1,6,7 * abstract * [Y] 4,5;
 [XA]EP0420131  (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1,6,9 * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 28; figure 1 * [A] 10;
 [Y]EP0666210  (NSK LTD [JP]) [Y] 4,5 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 9; figure 2 *