Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1040827

EP1040827 - Use of 3,4-dihydroxy-2-hydroxymethylpyrrolidine for the treatment of diabetes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/40]Use of 2-alkylpyrrolidines for the treatment of diabetes
[2005/46]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.10.2006
Database last updated on 18.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.10.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.11.2006  [2006/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NOVO NORDISK A/S
Novo Allé
2880 Bagsværd / DK
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]For all designated states
NOVO NORDISK A/S
Novo Allé
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Inventor(s)01 / Lundgren, Karsten
N. Jespersensvej 25
2000 Frederiksberg / DK
02 / Kristiansen, Marit
Gustav Esmanns Allé 2
2860 Soeborg / DK
03 / Jakobsen, Palle
Langkaer Vaenge 14
3500 Vaerloese / DK
04 / Norskov-Lauritsen, Leif
Strandvejen 80
4733 Tappernoeje / DK
05 / Naerum, Lars
Alrunevej 14
2900 Hellerup / DK
[2000/40]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00113261.206.09.1996
[2000/40]
Priority number, dateDK1995000099208.09.1995         Original published format: DK 99295
[2000/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1040827
Date:04.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1040827
Date:11.10.2000
[2000/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/40, A61P3/10
[2000/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/40]
Extension statesLT21.06.2000
LV21.06.2000
SI21.06.2000
TitleGerman:Verwendung von 3,4-dihydroxy-2-hydroxymethylpyrrolidin zur Behandlung von Diabetes[2005/46]
English:Use of 3,4-dihydroxy-2-hydroxymethylpyrrolidine for the treatment of diabetes[2005/46]
French:Utilisation de 3,4-dihydroxy-2-hydroxyméthylpyrrolidine pour le traitement du diabète[2005/46]
Former [2000/40]Verwendung von 3,4-dihydroxy-2-hydroxymethylpyrrolidin zur behandlung von diabetes
Former [2000/40]Use of 2-alkylpyrrolidines for the treatment of diabetes
Former [2000/40]Utilisation de 3,4-dihydroxy-2-hydroxyméthylepyrrolidine pour le traitement du diabète
Examination procedure21.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/40]
29.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.05.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/48]
13.06.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2006/48]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96928360.5  / EP0858335
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0389723  (MERRELL DOW PHARMA [US]) [Y] 1-12 * example -; claim - *;
 [Y]EP0422307  (MERRELL DOW PHARMA [US]) [Y] 1-12 * page 2, line 5; example -; claims 18-20 *;
 [A]EP0367747  (SEARLE & CO [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0322395  (MONSANTO CO [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *
 [PX]  CHEN, FU-JUN ET AL, "Potentiating effects on pilocarpine-induced saliva secretion, by extracts and N-containing sugars derived from mulberry leaves, in streptozocin- diabetic mice.", BIOLOGICAL & PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, (1995) VOL. 18, NO. 12, PP. 1676-1680., XP002144639 [PX] 1-5,10-12 * See table 1: DAB, RN= 100937-52-8 *; page 1676, columns 1-2 * * page 1678, columns 1-2; table 1 *
 [X]  ASANO N ET AL, "Nitrogen-in-the-ring pyranoses and furanoses: structural basis of inhibition of mammalian glycosidases.", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1994 OCT 28) 37 (22) 3701-6., XP002144640 [X] 1-5,10,12 * page 3701, column 1 * * See compounds 9,10 *;; table - *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00048a006
 [Y]  FLEET G W J ET AL, "THE SYNTHESIS FROM D XYLOSE OF THE POTENT AND SPECIFIC ENANTIOMERIC GLUCOSIDASE INHIBITORS 1 4 DIDEOXY-1 4-IMINO-D- ARABINITOL AND 1 4 DIDEOXY-1 4-IMINO-L- ARABINITOL.", TETRAHEDRON, (1986) 42 (20), 5685-5692., XP002144641 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(01)88174-6