Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1065339

EP1065339 - Fastening device for hinge flaps [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2004
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 29.08.2007  [2007/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Simonswerk GmbH
Bosfelder Weg 5
D-33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE
[2001/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Lüffe, Alfons
Wasserforth Strasse 5
33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE
 [2003/15]
Former [2001/01]01 / Lüffe, Alfons
WasserforthStrasse 5
33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE
Representative(s)Lelgemann, Karl-Heinz , et al
Patentanwälte Spalthoff und Lelgemann
Huyssenallee 70/72
45128 Essen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/06]Lelgemann, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Spalthoff und Lelgemann, Postfach 34 02 20
45074 Essen / DE
Former [2001/01]Spalthoff, Adolf, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. A. Spalthoff, Dipl.-Ing. K. Lelgemann, Postfach 34 02 20
45074 Essen / DE
Application number, filing date00113443.624.06.2000
[2001/01]
Priority number, dateDE199913044802.07.1999         Original published format: DE 19930448
[2001/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1065339
Date:03.01.2001
Language:DE
[2001/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1065339
Date:02.05.2002
[2002/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1065339
Date:03.09.2003
Language:DE
[2003/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:E05D7/04, E05D5/02
[2002/18]
Former International [2001/01]E05D7/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/01]
TitleGerman:Befestigungsvorrichtung für Bandlappen von Scharnieren[2001/01]
English:Fastening device for hinge flaps[2001/01]
French:Dispositif de fixation pour pentures de paumelles[2001/01]
Examination procedure27.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
04.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2003Fee for grant paid
01.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
20.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY03.09.2003
FI03.09.2003
FR03.09.2003
GB03.09.2003
IE03.09.2003
IT03.09.2003
NL03.09.2003
DK03.12.2003
GR03.12.2003
SE03.12.2003
ES14.12.2003
PT03.02.2004
[2007/35]
Former [2007/08]CY03.09.2003
FI03.09.2003
FR03.09.2003
GB03.09.2003
IE03.09.2003
NL03.09.2003
DK03.12.2003
GR03.12.2003
SE03.12.2003
ES14.12.2003
PT03.02.2004
Former [2006/14]FI03.09.2003
FR03.09.2003
GB03.09.2003
IE03.09.2003
NL03.09.2003
DK03.12.2003
GR03.12.2003
SE03.12.2003
ES14.12.2003
PT03.02.2004
Former [2004/46]FI03.09.2003
GB03.09.2003
IE03.09.2003
NL03.09.2003
DK03.12.2003
GR03.12.2003
SE03.12.2003
ES14.12.2003
PT03.02.2004
Former [2004/45]FI03.09.2003
GB03.09.2003
IE03.09.2003
NL03.09.2003
DK03.12.2003
GR03.12.2003
SE03.12.2003
PT03.02.2004
Former [2004/41]FI03.09.2003
IE03.09.2003
NL03.09.2003
DK03.12.2003
GR03.12.2003
SE03.12.2003
PT03.02.2004
Former [2004/31]FI03.09.2003
IE03.09.2003
NL03.09.2003
GR03.12.2003
SE03.12.2003
PT03.02.2004
Former [2004/29]FI03.09.2003
IE03.09.2003
NL03.09.2003
GR03.12.2003
SE03.12.2003
Former [2004/16]FI03.09.2003
NL03.09.2003
GR03.12.2003
SE03.12.2003
Former [2004/14]FI03.09.2003
NL03.09.2003
GR03.12.2003
Former [2004/13]FI03.09.2003
NL03.09.2003
Former [2004/12]FI03.09.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]DE9207403U  (BREUER & SCHMITZ) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3732023  (BUNSE FRIEDHELM [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4417039  (SIMONSWERK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [E]DE10039243  (BREUER & SCHMITZ GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [E] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [E]DE19923091  (STOSCHEK BEARBEITUNGS GMBH [DE]) [E] 1-9 * the whole document *