Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1066805 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1066805



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 151
12.04.2006 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
28.04.2005 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
04.04.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.04.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
04.04.2005 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
01.12.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
01.12.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
01.12.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
19.07.2004 Claims Search / examination 3
19.07.2004 Description Search / examination 7
19.07.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.07.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
30.06.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.06.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.06.2004 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 1
18.06.2004 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 1
26.04.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
20.04.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.04.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.12.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
17.12.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.07.2003 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
02.07.2003 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
01.06.2001 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.06.2001 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
03.04.2001 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
08.02.2001 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
08.02.2001 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.02.2001 European search report Search / examination 1
29.11.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
26.06.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.06.2000 Claims Search / examination 4
26.06.2000 Description Search / examination 19
26.06.2000 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
26.06.2000 Drawings Search / examination 4
26.06.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
26.06.2000 Priority document Search / examination 38
26.06.2000 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7