Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1066805


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.11.2008 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  24.12.2008  [2008/52]
03.10.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.11.2008  [2008/45]
27.07.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2007  [2007/35]
25.05.2007 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  27.06.2007  [2007/26]
13.04.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.05.2007  [2007/20]
19.01.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.02.2007  [2007/08]
09.06.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.07.2006  [2006/28]
26.05.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.06.2006  [2006/26]
19.05.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.06.2006  [2006/25]
14.04.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.05.2006  [2006/22]
14.04.2006 No opposition filed within time limit published on  31.05.2006  [2006/22]
17.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.04.2006  [2006/14]
10.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2006  [2006/13]
11.11.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2005  [2005/52]
28.10.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2005  [2005/50]
22.04.2005 (Expected) grant published on  08.06.2005  [2005/23]
13.04.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
13.04.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
25.11.2004 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
23.07.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
02.07.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.06.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
25.06.2004 Deletion: Reply to examination report
25.06.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
22.04.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
19.12.2003 First examination report
13.12.2003 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.07.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.06.2003 Change - representative published on  13.08.2003  [2003/33]
15.05.2002 Renewal fee
01.03.2002 Change - extension states
02.11.2001 Definitive list of designations published on  19.12.2001 [2001/51]
15.06.2001 Request for examination filed published on  01.08.2001 [2001/31]
09.02.2001 Publication of search report published on  28.03.2001 [2001/13]
24.11.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.01.2001 [2001/02]