Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1066805

EP1066805 - A bone anchor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.04.2006
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Atlantech Medical Devices Limited
Atlantech House, Freemans Way, Harrogate Business Park
Harrogate HG3 1DH / GB
[2001/02]
Inventor(s)01 / Gerke, Peter
Jahnstrase 26 a
42477 Radevormwald / DE
02 / Hein, Dietmar
Falckensteiner Strasse 42
24159 Kiel / DE
03 / Woods, Nicholas Paul, Atlantech Medical Devices
Atlantech House, Freemans Way, Harrogate Business
Park, Harrogate, N Yorkshire HG3 1DH / GB
04 / Reay-Young, Clive Bruce, Atlantech Medical Devices
Atlantech House, Freemans Way, Harrogate Business
Park, Harrogate, N Yorkshire HG3 1DH / GB
 [2001/02]
Representative(s)Kazi, Ilya , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/33]Kazi, Ilya , et al
Mathys & Squire, 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Former [2001/02]Walsh, David Patrick , et al
Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
Application number, filing date00113471.726.06.2000
[2001/02]
Priority number, dateGB1999001555003.07.1999         Original published format: GB 9915550
[2001/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1066805
Date:10.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1066805
Date:28.03.2001
[2001/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1066805
Date:08.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/08, A61B17/04
[2001/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/02]
TitleGerman:Knochenanker[2001/02]
English:A bone anchor[2001/02]
French:Elément d'ancrage dans un os[2001/02]
Examination procedure01.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/31]
17.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
19.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.2005Fee for grant paid
04.04.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.03.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
ES08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
FR08.06.2005
IT08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
CY26.06.2005
LU26.06.2005
IE27.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
[2008/52]
Former [2008/45]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
ES08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
IT08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
CY26.06.2005
LU26.06.2005
IE27.06.2005
FR30.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2007/35]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
ES08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
IT08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
CY26.06.2005
LU26.06.2005
IE27.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2007/26]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
ES08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
CY26.06.2005
LU26.06.2005
IE27.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2007/20]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
ES08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
CY26.06.2005
IE27.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
LU08.08.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2007/08]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
ES08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
IE27.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
LU08.08.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/28]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
IE27.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/26]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
IE27.06.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/25]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
IE27.06.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/22]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/14]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/13]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
SE08.09.2005
Former [2005/52]FI08.06.2005
SE08.09.2005
Former [2005/50]SE08.09.2005
Documents cited:Search[X]US5632748  (BECK JR CHARLES L ET AL) [X] 1-6,13 * column 6, line 19 - column 7, line 24; figure 1 * * column 14, line 11 - line 54; figure 10 *;
 [A]FR2725615  (CAFFINIERE JEAN YVES DE) [A] 1,4,5,13 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5707395  (LI LEHMANN K) [A] 1,4,5,13 * figures 4A,5; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0317406  (LABOUREAU JACQUES PHILIPPE) [A] 1 * abstract *