Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1034931

EP1034931 - Ink jet type recording head [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.08.2004
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2009Change - representativepublished on 09.09.2009  [2009/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Usui, Minoru, Seiko Epson Corp.
3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP
02 / Katakura, Takahiro, Seiko Epson Corp.
3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP
03 / Kanaya, Munehide, Seiko Epson Corp.
3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP
 [2004/23]
Former [2000/37]01 / Usui, Minori, Seiko Epson Corp.
3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP
02 / Katakura, Takahiro, Seiko Epson Corp.
3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP
03 / Kanaya, Munehide, Seiko Epson Corp.
3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP
Representative(s)Diehl, Hermann O. Th. , et al
Diehl & Partner GbR
Augustenstrasse 46
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/37]Diehl, Hermann O. Th. , et al
Diehl & Partner Augustenstrasse 46
80333 München / DE
Former [2000/37]Diehl, Hermann, Dr. , et al
DIEHL, GLÄSER, HILTL & PARTNER, Augustenstrasse 46
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date00113487.308.11.1996
[2000/37]
Priority number, dateJP1995031722410.11.1995         Original published format: JP 31722495
JP1996027709527.09.1996         Original published format: JP 27709596
[2000/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1034931
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1034931
Date:01.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/14, B41J2/15, B41J2/145
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/22]
Former [2000/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Aufzeichnungskopf des Tintenstrahltyps[2000/37]
English:Ink jet type recording head[2000/37]
French:Tête d'enregistrement du type à jet d'encre[2000/37]
Examination procedure26.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
31.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.07.2003Fee for grant paid
31.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96117927.2  / EP0773108
EP99124228.0  / EP0985536
Opposition(s)02.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
29.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0661156  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5,8,9,12 * column 5, paragraph L - column 6, line 27; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0554907  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 10 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0512799  (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 11,14,18,20 * abstract *;
 [A]JPS5838170
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830525), vol. 007, no. 120, Database accession no. (M - 217), [A] 15 * abstract *