Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1074334

EP1074334 - Mount for fixing a component by means of a symmetric dove-tail guide disposed on its outside [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.10.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 06.08.2008  [2008/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Leica Microsystems Wetzlar GmbH
Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37
35578 Wetzlar / DE
[2001/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Weiss, Albrecht
Schillerstrasse 18
35440 Linden / DE
 [2001/06]
Representative(s)Reichert, Werner Franz
Leica Microsystems GmbH
Corporate Patents and Trademarks
Postfach 20 20
35530 Wetzlar / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/32]Reichert, Werner Franz
Leica Microsystems GmbH Corporate Patents and Trademarks Postfach 20 20
35530 Wetzlar / DE
Former [2001/06]Reichert, Werner F., Dr.
Leica Microsystems International Holdings GmbH, Konzernstelle Patente + Marken, Postfach 20 20
35530 Wetzlar / DE
Application number, filing date00113641.528.06.2000
[2001/06]
Priority number, dateDE199913649705.08.1999         Original published format: DE 19936497
[2001/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1074334
Date:07.02.2001
Language:DE
[2001/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1074334
Date:18.12.2002
Language:DE
[2002/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP21.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:B23Q1/26, G12B9/08, G02B21/00, G02B21/16, G02B21/06, G01B5/00
[2001/06]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/43]
Former [2001/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Halterung zur Befestigung einer Komponente mit einem aussenseitig angeordneten, symmetrischen Schwalbenschwanzschlitten[2001/06]
English:Mount for fixing a component by means of a symmetric dove-tail guide disposed on its outside[2001/06]
French:Attache pour supporter un composant par une entaille extérieure à queue d'aronde symmétrique[2001/06]
Examination procedure07.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/32]
31.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.05.2002Fee for grant paid
02.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)19.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2316386  (LEITZ ERNST GMBH) [A] 1,3-5 * page 3, line 5 - page 7, line 3; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0323550  (LINEAR SYSTEM SRL [IT]) [A] 1,3 * column 3, line 41 - column 7, line 10; figures 3-12,18,19 *;
 [A]US5560572  (OSBORN DAVID R [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 39 - column 4, line 51; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]DE3610692  (LEITZ ERNST GMBH [DE]) [A] 3-5 * column 2, line 14 - column 5, line 61; figures 1-9 *;
 [A]US3813132  (SAHM B) [A] 1 * column 1, line 3 - column 3, line 15; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE19508541  (LEUZE ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 60 - column 3, line 6; figures 1-3 *