blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1065917

EP1065917 - Calibrating method for part mounting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  19.12.2003
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip19.12.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 04.02.2004  [2004/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/01]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamaguchi, Minoru, c/o Sony Corporation
7-35,Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2001/01]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Straße 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/01]MÜLLER & HOFFMANN Patentanwälte
Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date00113695.128.06.2000
[2001/01]
Priority number, dateJP1999018430429.06.1999         Original published format: JP 18430499
[2001/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1065917
Date:03.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1065917
Date:02.01.2002
[2002/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.11.2001
ClassificationIPC:H05K13/08, H05K13/04
[2001/01]
CPC:
H05K13/0413 (EP); H05K13/0818 (EP); H05K13/089 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/38]
Former [2001/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kalibrierungsverfahren für eine Bauteile-bestückungsvorrichtung[2001/01]
English:Calibrating method for part mounting apparatus[2001/01]
French:Méthode de calibration pour machine de pose de composants[2001/01]
Examination procedure05.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/32]
27.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.11.2003Fee for grant paid
12.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.12.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0273561  (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [A] 1-6 * page 2, lines 37-49 * * page 3, lines 28-52 * * page 5, lines 3-13,45-49 * * page 6, lines 3-30; figures 1-13 *;
 [A]EP0886465  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5 * abstract *;
 [A]US5729895  (KIM SUNG-WOON [KR]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 27; figures 1-10 *;
 [DA]JPS63300843  ;
 [A]JPS61188056
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890404), vol. 013, no. 133, Database accession no. (M - 809), & JP63300843 A 19881208 (SONY CORP) [DA] 1,2 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870110), vol. 011, no. 010, Database accession no. (M - 552), & JP61188056 A 19860821 (NEC HOME ELECTRONICS LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.