Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1065721

EP1065721 - Standard cells and method for placing and routing thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  09.09.2005
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.09.2005Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 26.10.2005  [2005/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Electronics Corporation
1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/19]For all designated states
NEC Electronics Corporation
1753 Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP
Former [2001/01]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kozai, Atsuko, c/o NEC IC Microcomputers Systems
403-53, Kosugimachi 1-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[2001/01]
Representative(s)Betten & Resch
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 02 51
80076 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/01]Betten & Resch
Reichenbachstrasse 19
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date00113701.728.06.2000
[2001/01]
Priority number, dateJP1999018244528.06.1999         Original published format: JP 18244599
[2001/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1065721
Date:03.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1065721
Date:15.10.2003
[2003/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.08.2003
ClassificationInternational:H01L27/118, G06F17/50, H01L23/528
[2003/42]
Former International [2001/01]H01L27/118
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/28]
Former [2001/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Standardzellen und deren Plazierungs- und Leitungslegeverfahren[2001/01]
English:Standard cells and method for placing and routing thereof[2001/01]
French:Cellule standard et son procédé d'acheminement et placement[2001/01]
Examination procedure19.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/21]
30.08.2005Application withdrawn by applicant  [2005/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0609096  (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [US]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 3-5,9;
 [DA]JPH0555381  ;
 [A]JPH06209044  ;
 [A]JPH1145942
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930706), vol. 0173, no. 56, Database accession no. (E - 1394), [DA] 1,3 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941031), vol. 0185, no. 70, Database accession no. (E - 1623), [A] 1,3 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 05, [A] 4,5,9 * abstract *