EP1067503 - Display units [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R.E.D. Revital Entrepreneurship & Development Ltd. 11 Menachem Begin Street Ramat Gan 52681 / IL | [2006/13] |
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states M.V.T. Multi Vision Technologies Ltd. 19 Ha'Melacha Street New Industrial Zone Rosh Ha'Ayin 48091 / IL | ||
Former [2001/02] | For all designated states M.V.T. Multi Vision Technologies Ltd. 15 Hamarez Street Rosh Ha Ayin 48017 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bar-Yona, Itzchak Rechov Hohit 27, Givat Hasalim Rosh Ha'Ayin 48552 / IL | [2001/02] | Representative(s) | Zeitler, Giselher Zeitler Volpert Kandlbinder Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 26 02 51 80059 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Zeitler, Giselher Zeitler - Volpert - Kandlbinder Patentanwälte Herrnstrasse 44 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/47] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2001/02] | Volpert, Marcus, Dr. Patentanwälte Kern, Brehm & Partner GbR Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 73 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00113793.4 | 29.06.2000 | [2001/02] | Priority number, date | IL19990130782 | 04.07.1999 Original published format: IL 13078299 | [2001/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1067503 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1067503 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | [2001/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1067503 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G09F11/00 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
G09F11/00 (EP,US);
G03B25/02 (KR);
G09F19/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/02] | Extension states | RO | 24.09.2001 | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung | [2001/02] | English: | Display units | [2001/02] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage | [2001/02] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/48] | 13.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   06.08.2003 | 30.06.2005 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   25.08.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 27.10.2004 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2005/44] | 01.02.2006 | Resumption of proceedings | [2005/44] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.02.2008 | BE | 27.02.2008 | CY | 27.02.2008 | DK | 27.02.2008 | FI | 27.02.2008 | IT | 27.02.2008 | NL | 27.02.2008 | SE | 27.05.2008 | DE | 28.05.2008 | GR | 28.05.2008 | ES | 07.06.2008 | LU | 29.06.2008 | CH | 30.06.2008 | IE | 30.06.2008 | LI | 30.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | PT | 21.07.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/28] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
DE | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
LU | 29.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
IE | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
DE | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
IE | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
DE | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
IE | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
DE | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
IE | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
DE | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
DE | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | ES | 07.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0254816 ; | [AD]JPH02211437 ; | [XA]US5494445 (SEKIGUCHI YOSHI [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-4,7-10,12 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900509), vol. 014, no. 218, Database accession no. (E - 0925), & JP02054816 A 19900223 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901107), vol. 014, no. 508, Database accession no. (P - 1128), & JP02211437 A 19900822 (TAKU KUMAGAI) [AD] 1 * abstract * |