blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1167261

EP1167261 - Device for making up and aligning loose stacked printed products [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  02.12.2005
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Segbert GmbH & Co. KG
Gutenbergstrasse 16
48683 Ahaus / DE
[2004/13]
Former [2002/01]For all designated states
Segbert GmbH & Co. Kommanditgesellschaft
Daimlerstrasse 27
48683 Ahaus / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Segbert, Stephan
Bahnhofstr. 47
48619 Heek / DE
 [2002/01]
Representative(s)Rohmann, Michael, et al
Andrejewski - Honke
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
An der Reichsbank 8
45127 Essen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/32]Rohmann, Michael, Dr., et al
Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien Theaterplatz 3
45127 Essen / DE
Former [2002/28]Kelly, Peter F., et al
F. R. Kelly & Co., 27 Clyde Road, Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Former [2002/01]Rohmann, Michael, Dr., et al
Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien Theaterplatz 3
45127 Essen / DE
Application number, filing date00113854.430.06.2000
[2002/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1167261
Date:02.01.2002
Language:DE
[2002/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1167261
Date:04.02.2004
Language:DE
[2004/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.01.2001
ClassificationIPC:B65H31/10
[2002/01]
CPC:
B65H31/10 (EP); B65H2301/4223 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/01]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Bilden und Ausrichten von Paketen lose gestapelter Druckerzeugnisse[2002/01]
English:Device for making up and aligning loose stacked printed products[2002/01]
French:Dispositif pour former et aligner des paquets de produits d'imprimerie mobiles empilés[2002/01]
Examination procedure22.09.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/17]
14.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.2003Fee for grant paid
29.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.11.2004    ADMISSIBLE
Müller Martini Holding AG
Sonnenbergstrasse 13
6052 Hergiswil / CH
Opponent's representative
Kraus, Jürgen Helmut
Leinweber & Zimmermann
Patentanwalts-PartG mbB
Viktualienmarkt 8
80331 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2005/01]
Opponent(s)01  04.11.2004    ADMISSIBLE
Müller Martini Holding AG
Sonnenbergstrasse 13
6052 Hergiswil / CH
Opponent's representative
Kraus, Jürgen Helmut, Dipl.-Phys. Dr.
Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7
80331 München / DE
03.02.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.08.2005Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
27.10.2005Legal effect of revocation of patent [2006/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200304   M06   Fee paid on   04.07.2003
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY04.02.2004
IE04.02.2004
GR04.05.2004
LU30.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
PT04.07.2004
IT30.06.2005
[2008/03]
Former [2007/34]CY04.02.2004
IE04.02.2004
GR04.05.2004
LU30.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
IT30.06.2005
Former [2007/08]CY04.02.2004
IE04.02.2004
GR04.05.2004
LU30.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
Former [2005/23]IE04.02.2004
GR04.05.2004
LU30.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
Former [2005/11]IE04.02.2004
GR04.05.2004
MC30.06.2004
Former [2005/03]IE04.02.2004
GR04.05.2004
Former [2004/41]GR04.05.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]US4547112  (STEINHART HORST K [US]) [X] 1-4,6 * column 2, line 61 - column 4, line 68; figure - *;
 [XA]EP0243944  (STAHL GMBH & CO MASCHF [DE]) [X] 1-3 * column 9, line 41 - line 44 * * column 10, line 19 - column 11, line 34; figure - * [A] 6;
 [A]DE3742787  (PALAMIDES SESTO [DE], et al) [A] 6* column 9, line 20 - line 59; figure - *;
 [X]DE4408780  (GAEMMERLER GUNTER [DE]) [X] 1-3,6 * column 5, line 53 - column 7, line 58; figure - *;
 [X]DE19615009  (SMB SCHWEDE MASCHINENBAU GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 9 - line 50 * * column 5, line 5 - line 55; figure - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.