Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1037505

EP1037505 - Audio equipment and method of displaying operation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.04.2003
Database last updated on 22.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.06.2003  [2003/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Fujishita, Kaneaki
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Sakurai, Osamu
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Nagahara, Junichi
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London
WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date00113888.217.12.1992
[2000/38]
Priority number, dateJP1991033366817.12.1991         Original published format: JP 33366891
JP1991033514718.12.1991         Original published format: JP 33514791
JP1991033695019.12.1991         Original published format: JP 33695091
JP1991033721519.12.1991         Original published format: JP 33721591
JP1991033723119.12.1991         Original published format: JP 33723191
JP1991033871420.12.1991         Original published format: JP 33871491
[2000/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1037505
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1037505
Date:05.09.2001
[2001/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04S7/00
[2000/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/38]
TitleGerman:Tonsystem und Verfahren zur Betriebsanzeige[2000/38]
English:Audio equipment and method of displaying operation thereof[2000/38]
French:Système audio et méthode d'affichage de fonctionnement[2000/38]
Examination procedure22.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/18]
09.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.11.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/24]
14.01.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/24]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP93900391.9  / EP0571638
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 09
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200211   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5040220  (IWAMATSU MASAYUKI [JP]) [A] 1,2 * column 1, lines 9-15 * * column 2, lines 40-68 * * column 3, line 50 - column 26, line 46 *;
 [A]EP0276948  (YAMAHA CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2 * column 1, lines 3-14 * * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 24 *