Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1070650

EP1070650 - Assembly comprising a steering column and a steering wheel [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.08.2006
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.08.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.09.2006  [2006/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TRW Automotive Safety Systems GmbH & Co. KG
Hefner-Alteneck-Strasse 11
63743 Aschaffenburg / DE
[2001/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Hirzmann, Guido
Sickenbergerstrasse 36
63877 Sailauf / DE
 [2001/04]
Representative(s)Sties, Jochen
Prinz & Partner GbR
Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/04]Sties, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing.
Prinz & Partner Patentanwälte Manzingerweg 7
81241 München / DE
Application number, filing date00114013.604.07.2000
[2001/04]
Priority number, dateDE1999212741U21.07.1999         Original published format: DE 29912741 U
[2001/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1070650
Date:24.01.2001
Language:DE
[2001/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1070650
Date:07.07.2004
[2004/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP24.05.2004
ClassificationInternational:B62D1/10
[2001/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2005/13]
Former [2001/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Baugruppe aus einer Lenkwelle und einem Lenkrad[2001/04]
English:Assembly comprising a steering column and a steering wheel[2001/04]
French:Assemblage d'un arbre de direction et d'un volant[2001/04]
Examination procedure23.12.2004Examination requested  [2005/08]
08.01.2005Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
26.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.04.2005Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
29.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.2005Date of oral proceedings
04.11.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
18.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/38]
04.05.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2006/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
09.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
08.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
11.02.2005AT   M01   Not yet paid
11.02.2005BE   M01   Not yet paid
11.02.2005CH   M01   Not yet paid
11.02.2005CY   M01   Not yet paid
11.02.2005DK   M01   Not yet paid
11.02.2005FI   M01   Not yet paid
11.02.2005GR   M01   Not yet paid
11.02.2005IE   M01   Not yet paid
11.02.2005LU   M01   Not yet paid
11.02.2005MC   M01   Not yet paid
11.02.2005NL   M01   Not yet paid
11.02.2005PT   M01   Not yet paid
11.02.2005SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US1640763  (GEYER HARVEY D, et al) [X] 1,5 * figures 1-6 * * page 1, line 9 - page 1, line 20 * * page 1, line 76 - page 2, line 102 * [Y] 2;
 [Y]US1459040  (E.H. VINCENT) [Y] 2 * figures 1,2,9 * * page 1, line 94 - page 1, line 109 *;
 [A]DE29518638U  (NARDI ITALIA SPA [IT]) [A] 4 * figures 1,2 * * page 6, line 31 - page 8, line 9 *;
 [PX]EP0936128  (GERSTEEN ISO DELTA [FR]) [PX] 1,2,5 * figures 15-18 * * column 11, line 15 - column 12, line 36 *