Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1170846 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1170846



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 825
11.10.2012 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
11.10.2012 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
09.10.2012 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
13.09.2012 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
13.09.2012 French translation of claims Opposition 3
13.09.2012 German translation of the claims Opposition 3
15.06.2012 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
15.06.2012 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
15.06.2012 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
15.06.2012 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 13
12.06.2012 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
12.06.2012 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
18.04.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
12.04.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
10.04.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.04.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.04.2012 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Search / examination 22
04.04.2012 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 22
04.04.2012 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Opposition 22
22.02.2012 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 14
22.02.2012 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Opposition 14
26.01.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.01.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.01.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.01.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
16.11.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.11.2011 Claims Appeal 21
03.11.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
03.11.2011 Non-scannable object Appeal 6
02.11.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 39
11.10.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.10.2011 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 2
30.09.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
28.09.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
27.09.2011 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
26.09.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
23.09.2011 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
23.09.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.09.2011 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
21.09.2011 F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet Appeal 2
15.09.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
15.09.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
23.08.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.08.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
15.08.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
12.08.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
09.08.2011 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 19
04.08.2011 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
27.05.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Search / examination 1
08.05.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.04.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
20.04.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.04.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
14.04.2009 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 8
07.01.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.12.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
30.12.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.12.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
23.12.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 6
15.12.2008 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 2
06.12.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
06.12.2008 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
04.12.2008 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 19
02.12.2008 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
01.12.2008 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
07.10.2008 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
06.10.2008 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
02.10.2008 Notice of appeal Appeal 4
16.09.2008 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
11.09.2008 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
08.09.2008 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
11.08.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.08.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.08.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.08.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
04.08.2008 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
04.08.2008 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 14
04.08.2008 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
04.08.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
04.08.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
04.08.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
04.08.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
04.08.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
04.08.2008 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.08.2008 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
04.08.2008 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 9
04.08.2008 Text intended for grant Opposition 13
27.06.2008 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.05.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.05.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.05.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
26.05.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
23.05.2008 Claims Opposition 3
23.05.2008 Claims Opposition 3
23.05.2008 Claims Opposition 3
23.05.2008 Claims Opposition 3
23.05.2008 Claims Opposition 3
23.05.2008 Claims Opposition 3
23.05.2008 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
23.05.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
23.05.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
23.05.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
23.05.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
23.05.2008 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 15
23.05.2008 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
29.03.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.03.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.03.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.03.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
20.03.2008 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
20.03.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.03.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.03.2008 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
13.03.2008 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 2
06.03.2008 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
05.03.2008 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.01.2008 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.01.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
15.01.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
15.01.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
13.03.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.03.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
06.03.2007 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 8
02.01.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.01.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
14.12.2006 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
06.09.2006 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
06.09.2006 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
28.07.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.07.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.07.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.07.2006 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
13.07.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.07.2006 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
13.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
13.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
13.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
13.07.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
10.07.2006 Notice of opposition Opposition 15
18.11.2005 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
08.11.2005 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
26.10.2005 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 13
26.10.2005 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 3
25.10.2005 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 13
25.10.2005 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 3
15.09.2005 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
31.08.2005 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
17.08.2005 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
17.08.2005 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 2
03.08.2005 Claims Search / examination 1
03.08.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
03.08.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
03.08.2005 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
29.04.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
29.04.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
29.04.2005 Text intended for grant Search / examination 33
14.06.2004 Claims Search / examination 1
14.06.2004 Description Search / examination 15
14.06.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.04.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
23.04.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.09.2003 Claims Search / examination 1
24.09.2003 Description Search / examination 2
24.09.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.08.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
28.07.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.03.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
17.03.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.05.2002 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
15.01.2002 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
28.11.2001 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
11.06.2001 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
11.06.2001 Claims Search / examination 6
11.06.2001 Description Search / examination 3
13.12.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
13.12.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.12.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
21.09.2000 Drawings Search / examination 4
21.09.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
30.08.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.08.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.08.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.08.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.08.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.07.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
07.07.2000 Claims Search / examination 6
07.07.2000 Description Search / examination 22
07.07.2000 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.07.2000 Drawings Search / examination 4
07.07.2000 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6