Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1067312

EP1067312 - Six speed transmission for motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.10.2002
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ford Global Technologies, Inc., A subsidiary of Ford Motor Company
600 Parklane Towers East Dearborn
Michigan 48126 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/02]For all designated states
Ford Global Technologies, Inc., A subsidiary of Ford Motor Company
600 Parklane Towers East
Dearborn, Michigan 48126 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bungart, Stephan
Remscheider Strasse 261a
42855 Remscheid / DE
02 / Dahl, Peter
Gerhard Hauptmann Strasse 49
51515 Kuerten / DE
03 / Hegerath, Andreas
Eschenweg 5
50126 Bergheim / DE
04 / Chazotte, Jean-Pierre
Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 6
50996 Köln / DE
05 / Eggert, Ulrich
Konenpfad 28
41751 Viersen / DE
06 / Nett, Hans Peter
Zum Eckernbaum 14
53518 Adenau / DE
 [2001/02]
Representative(s)Messulam, Alec Moses
Harrison IP Limited
3 Ebor House
London Ebor Business Park
Millfield Lane
Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Messulam, Alec Moses
A. Messulam & Co. Ltd. 43-45 High Road Bushy Heath Bushy
Hertfordshire WD23 1EE / GB
Former [2001/37]Messulam, Alec Moses
A. Messulam & Co. Ltd., 43-45 High Road
Bushey Heath, Bushey, Herts WD23 1EE / GB
Former [2001/02]Drömer, Hans-Carsten, Dipl.-Ing.
Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung NH/DRP
50725 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date00114205.803.07.2000
[2001/02]
Priority number, dateEP1999011292705.07.1999         Original published format: EP 99112927
[2001/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1067312
Date:10.01.2001
Language:DE
[2001/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1067312
Date:12.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16H3/091, F16H3/093
[2001/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   SE [2001/39]
Former [2001/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:6-Gang-Schaltgetriebe für Kraftfahrzeuge[2001/02]
English:Six speed transmission for motor vehicles[2001/02]
French:Transmission à six rapports pour véhicules automobiles[2001/02]
Examination procedure09.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/06]
09.11.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
30.01.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.01.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
29.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.08.2001Fee for grant paid
08.08.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE12.03.2002
ES27.06.2002
[2004/04]
Former [2002/25]SE12.03.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]US5025674  (MCASKILL JOHN P [US]) [A] 1,9 * column 1 - column 2; figure 2 *;
 [A]US5311789  (HENZLER HELGA [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 5 - column 7; figures 1,7 *;
 [A]DE19524233  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2 - column 3; figures 1,2 *;
 [DA]DE19624857  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract *;
 [DA]EP0046373  (AUTOMOTIVE PROD PLC [GB]) [DA] 1 * abstract *;
 [DA]EP0083747  (FORD WERKE AG [DE], et al) [DA] 1 * abstract *
by applicantEP0046373
 EP0083747
 DE19624857