Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1078713

EP1078713 - Clamping apparatus with datum function [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  16.12.2005
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.12.2005Opposition rejectedpublished on 01.02.2006  [2006/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOSMEK
1-2 Murotani 2-Chome, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi
Hyogo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/09]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOSMEK
1-2 Murotani 2-Chome, Nishi-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yonezawa, Keitaro, Kabushiki Kaisha Kosmek
1-2, Murotani 2-chome, Nishi-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo / JP
02 / Shirakawa, Tsutomu, Kabushiki Kaisha Kosmek
1-2, Murotani 2-chome, Nishi-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo / JP
 [2001/09]
Representative(s)Horton, Andrew Robert Grant , et al
Bowles Horton
Felden House
Dower Mews
High Street
Berkhamsted, Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/09]Horton, Andrew Robert Grant , et al
BOWLES HORTON Felden House Dower Mews High Street
Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB
Application number, filing date00114212.403.07.2000
[2001/09]
Priority number, dateJP1999021950403.08.1999         Original published format: JP 21950499
[2001/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1078713
Date:28.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1078713
Date:18.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:B23Q3/18, B23Q7/14, B23Q16/08, B23Q11/00
[2001/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/46]
Former [2001/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Spannvorrichtung mit Ausrichtfunktion[2001/09]
English:Clamping apparatus with datum function[2001/09]
French:Dispositif de serrage avec fonction d'alignement[2001/09]
Examination procedure01.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/31]
29.08.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
29.08.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
02.01.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY
04.01.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
05.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
10.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
16.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2002Fee for grant paid
11.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.09.2003   
PASCAL ENGINEERING CORPORATION
8-8, Chuo-cho, Kawanishi-shi
Hyogo, 666-0016 / JP
Opponent's representative
Senior, Alan Murray
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2003/46]
Opponent(s)01  16.09.2003   
PASCAL ENGINEERING CORPORATION
8-8, Chuo-cho, Kawanishi-shi
Hyogo, 666-0016 / JP
Opponent's representative
Senior, Alan Murray
J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
23.10.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.04.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
31.08.2005Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.09.2005
31.08.2005Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.09.2005Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
15.09.2005Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2006/05]
15.09.2005Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
15.10.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
15.10.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
15.10.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
15.10.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
15.10.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
15.10.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
15.10.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
15.10.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
15.10.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
15.10.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
15.10.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
15.10.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
15.10.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
15.10.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US4512068  (PIOTROWSKI TADEUSZ W [US]) [A] 1,2 * figures 3,4; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]US5415384  (OBRIST BASIL [CH], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]US5190272  (ZIKA FRANK J [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0827806  (STARK EMIL JR [AT]) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4636135  (BANCON GEORGES R [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0913587  (KOSMEK KK [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 4,5 *