Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1066987

EP1066987 - Vehicle tyre [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.10.2006
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Continental Aktiengesellschaft
Vahrenwalder Strasse 9
30165 Hannover / DE
[2001/02]
Inventor(s)01 / Metge, Axel
Vahrenheider Markt 8
30179 Hannover / DE
02 / Wies, Burkhard, Dr.
Kieselgurweg 20
30455 Hannover / DE
03 / Walczok, Mario
Irisweg 22
30900 Wedemark / DE
04 / Baumhöfer, Johannes Josef
Ortsriede 21
30900 Wedemark / DE
 [2001/02]
Application number, filing date00114351.005.07.2000
[2001/02]
Priority number, dateDE199913202709.07.1999         Original published format: DE 19932027
[2001/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1066987
Date:10.01.2001
Language:DE
[2001/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1066987
Date:02.01.2002
[2002/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1066987
Date:30.11.2005
Language:DE
[2005/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP16.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:B60C3/04, B60C13/00
[2001/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   PT [2002/38]
Former [2001/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Fahrzeugluftreifen[2001/02]
English:Vehicle tyre[2001/02]
French:Bandage pneumatique pour véhicule[2001/02]
Examination procedure02.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
23.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.2005Fee for grant paid
04.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
02.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
01.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR30.11.2005
GB30.11.2005
IT30.11.2005
ES13.03.2006
PT02.05.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2007/35]GB30.11.2005
IT30.11.2005
ES13.03.2006
PT02.05.2006
Former [2007/08]GB30.11.2005
ES13.03.2006
PT02.05.2006
Former [2006/48]ES13.03.2006
PT02.05.2006
Former [2006/33]ES13.03.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0273558  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 17 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0292563  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 3 * * figure 4 *