blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1069415

EP1069415 - Method and apparatus for a spectroscopic examination of plasticized extrudates [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.08.2006
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/47]For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27 c
80686 München / DE
Former [2001/03]For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
80636 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Rohe, Thomas
Ringstrasse 8
76327 Pfinztal / DE
 [2001/03]
Representative(s)(deleted)
[2005/29]
Former [2001/03]Lempert, Jost, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. rer.nat.
Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. rer. nat. Jost Lempert, Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch, Postfach 41 07 60
76207 Karlsruhe / DE
Application number, filing date00114378.305.07.2000
[2001/03]
Priority number, dateDE1999103274614.07.1999         Original published format: DE 19932746
[2001/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1069415
Date:17.01.2001
Language:DE
[2001/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1069415
Date:06.11.2002
[2002/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1069415
Date:28.09.2005
Language:DE
[2005/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.09.2002
ClassificationIPC:G01J3/46
[2001/03]
CPC:
G01N21/85 (EP); B29C48/92 (EP); G01N21/3563 (EP);
B29C2948/92019 (EP); B29C2948/92076 (EP); B29C2948/92209 (EP);
B29C2948/92247 (EP); B29C2948/92257 (EP); B29C2948/9238 (EP);
B29C48/09 (EP); B29C48/12 (EP); G01N2021/3155 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/30]
Former [2001/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur spektroskopischen Untersuchung von plastifizierten Extrudaten[2001/03]
English:Method and apparatus for a spectroscopic examination of plasticized extrudates[2001/03]
French:Méthode et dispositif pour l'examen spectroscopique d'extrudats plastifiés[2001/03]
Examination procedure20.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/14]
07.05.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
08.09.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
18.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.07.2005Fee for grant paid
15.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
18.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.06.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR28.09.2005
GB28.09.2005
IT28.09.2005
ES08.01.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2007/35]GB28.09.2005
IT28.09.2005
ES08.01.2006
Former [2007/08]GB28.09.2005
ES08.01.2006
Former [2006/33]ES08.01.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH06304995  ;
 [A]GB1593474  (BERWIND CORP) [A] 1,4* page 1, paragraph 5 - paragraph 6 *;
 [DA]DE3505036  (WERNER & PFLEIDERER [DE]) [DA] 1,4 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0816815  (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1,4 * figure 1 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950331), vol. 1995, no. 02, & JP06304995 A 19941101 (FUJIKURA LTD) [A] 1,4 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.