Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1035696

EP1035696 - Multiresolution transmission, in particular for multicarrier systems [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/37]Mutliresolution transmission system
[2002/16]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.10.2003
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Oshima, Mitsuaki
115-3, Tatsumi-cho, Katsura Minami, Nishikyo-ku
Kyoto / JP
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Martinistrasse 24
28195 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date00114577.024.09.1993
[2000/37]
Priority number, dateJP1992025607025.09.1992         Original published format: JP 25607092
JP1993006646125.03.1993         Original published format: JP 6646193
JP1993013298410.05.1993         Original published format: JP 13298493
[2000/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1035696
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1035696
Date:06.12.2000
[2000/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1035696
Date:18.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04L27/02, H04L27/18, H04L27/26, H04L27/34
[2002/15]
Former International [2000/49]H04L27/02, H04L27/18, H04L27/26, H04L27/34, H04L27/38, H04N7/24
Former International [2000/37]H04L27/02, H04L27/34, H04L27/26, H04L27/18, H04N7/24
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/37]
TitleGerman:Übertragung mit mehreren Auflösungen, insbesondere für Mehrträgersysteme[2002/16]
English:Multiresolution transmission, in particular for multicarrier systems[2002/16]
French:Transmission à résolutions multiples, en particulier pour systèmes multiporteuse[2002/16]
Former [2000/37]System zur Übertragung mit mehreren Auflösungen
Former [2000/37]Mutliresolution transmission system
Former [2000/37]Système de transmission à résolutions multiples
Examination procedure07.07.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
14.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
06.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.08.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
05.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
15.10.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
18.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.10.2002Fee for grant paid
18.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP93307575.6  / EP0589709
Opposition(s)19.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
07.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
07.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
07.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
07.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 09
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0448492  (FRANCE ETAT [FR], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 4, line 13 - line 20 * * page 4, line 28 - line 30 * * page 5, line 10 - line 14 * * page 5, line 24 - line 28 * * page 7, line 11 - line 12 * * page 7, line 38 - line 58 *;
 [XP]EP0531046  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [XP] 1-7 * column 4, line 47 - line 51 * * column 5, line 1 - line 10 * * column 7, line 16 - line 23 * * column 7, line 34 - line 40 *;
 [AP]EP0506400  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [AP] 1-7 * page 3, line 4 - line 9 * * page 12, line 15 - line 17 * * page 16, line 22 - line 23 *
 [A]  - SCHREIBER, "Spread-spectrum television broadcasting", SMPTE JOURNAL, Scarsdale, US, (199208), vol. 101, no. 8, pages 538 - 549, XP000296026 [A] 1-7 * page 542, column L, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * * page 547, column R, paragraph 3 - page 548, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 543, column R, paragraph 2 *
 [A]  - COVER, "Broadcast channels", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (197201), vol. IT-18, no. 1, pages 2 - 14, XP000760860 [A] 1-7 * page 3, column R, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIT.1972.1054727