Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1049334

EP1049334 - Signal transmission system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.07.2004
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/35]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Former [2000/44]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Oshima, Mitsuaki
115-3, Katsura, Minamitatsumi-cho, Nishikyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto fu 615 / JP
[2000/44]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Martinistrasse 24
28195 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date00114691.926.03.1992
[2000/44]
Priority number, dateJP1991006279827.03.1991         Original published format: JP 6279891
JP1991009581325.04.1991         Original published format: JP 9581391
JP1991015565029.05.1991         Original published format: JP 15565091
JP1991018223623.07.1991         Original published format: JP 18223691
JP1992006073917.03.1992         Original published format: JP 6073992
[2000/51]
Former [2000/44]JP1991006279827.03.1991
JP1991009581325.04.1991
JP1991015565029.05.1991
JP1991018223623.07.1991
JP1992003073917.03.1992
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1049334
Date:02.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/44]
Type: A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication 
No.:EP1049334
Date:20.12.2000
[2000/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1049334
Date:27.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/24, H04L27/34, H04N7/04
[2000/44]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/44]
TitleGerman:Signalübertragungssystem[2000/44]
English:Signal transmission system[2000/44]
French:Système de transmission de signal[2000/44]
Examination procedure08.07.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
15.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
12.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.02.2003Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
23.06.2003Fee for grant paid
23.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP92302627.2  / EP0506400
EP96119060.0  / EP0766478
Opposition(s)28.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
08.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
08.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
08.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
08.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
08.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 09
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 10
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 11
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR27.08.2003
NL27.08.2003
DE28.11.2003
[2006/14]
Former [2004/31]NL27.08.2003
DE28.11.2003
Former [2004/13]NL27.08.2003
Documents cited:Search[E]EP0485108  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [E] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [E]EP0485105  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [E] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4751478  (YOSHIDA YASUHARU [JP]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4630287  (ARMSTRONG THOMAS [US]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3909721  (BUSSGANG JULIAN J, et al) [A] 1-5 * column 17, line 9 - line 52 *;
 [A]US4937844  (KAO MING-LUH [US]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *
 [X]  HILL T ET AL, "A PERFORMANCE STUDY OF NLA 64-STATE QAM", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (198306), vol. COM-31, no. 6, ISSN 0090-6778, pages 821 - 826, XP000758653 [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [000I] - [0III]; figures 1-3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCOM.1983.1095894